Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

New Zealand Dragon Boat Association Incorporated
NZDBA
CC44965
9429042993018
Deregistered
02/05/2017
This entity was removed from the Charities Register under section 32(1)(b) of the Charities Act because it failed to file Annual Returns as required by section 41 of the Charities Act.

Below are details of New Zealand Dragon Boat Association Incorporated at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

17/08/2010
June 30

Registration history

Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 2/05/2017 This entity was removed from the Charities Register under section 32(1)(b) of the Charities Act because it failed to file Annual Returns as required by section 41 of the Charities Act.
Registered 17/08/2010

Address for service

PO Box 29318
Fendalton
Christchurch
8540
8 Gleneagles Terrace
Ilam
Christchurch
8053

Charity's other details

03 358 1633
03 358 6852
www.facebook.com/nz.dragonboat


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Vision is To encourage excellence in Dragon Boating as a fit for life sport. For anyone and everyone. More paddlers, better.” And the Purpose of NZDBA is “To foster and develop excellence in New Zealand Dragon Boating” under the Pillars of - 'High Performance' (Foster and develop excellence in NZ dragon boating); - 'Participation' (make Dragon boating the sport for all); - 'Communications and PR' (All are informed and aware of dragon boating); and - 'Operational Capabilities' (foster growth by ensuring accessible, appropriate, relevant national capabilities are in place)

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Sport / recreation

Education / training / research, People with disabilities

Children / young people

Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public, Family / whanau, Religious groups

Entity Structure

Incorporated Society, governed by a board of about 9 paddlers who come from various regions in NZ, and bring the voice of a large range of Dragon Boaters.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 17/11/2016 $237,725 $209,449 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/06/2013 31/12/2013 1/10/2013 $92,350 $86,873 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2012 31/12/2012 31/08/2012 $100,436 $81,894 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2011 31/12/2011 5/09/2011 $62,861 $61,287 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2010 31/12/2010 20/12/2010 $67,956 $61,959 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Colleen Harris Special Interests Director 15/08/2015
Heather Bisset Secretary 15/08/2015
Jennie Colver Treasurer 17/08/2013
Ricky Greaves PR and Communications Director 23/08/2011
Meri Gibson Equipment Director and Event Director 31/10/2009
Noel Keith Anderton Chair 31/10/2009
Shane Petley Development Director 31/10/2009
Sooupu Perese Junior Development, and Deputy Equipment Director 31/10/2009

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Chris Stone Director 15/08/2015
Mary Mcavoy Director 15/08/2015
Natalie Fowlie Secretary 17/08/2013
Tery Hardwicke Treasurer 17/08/2013

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
15/04/2016 NOC008
15/04/2016 NOC007
15/04/2016 NOC006
15/04/2016 NOC005
1/10/2013 AR005
5/09/2011 AR003
20/12/2010 AR002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.