Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Friends of Palmerston North City Library Incorporated
Friends of the Palmerston North City Library Incorporated
CC45335
9429042700586
Deregistered
10/06/2018

Financial information at the time of Deregistration:

$0
$0

Below are details of Friends of Palmerston North City Library Incorporated at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

14/09/2010
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 1948
Palmerston North Central
Palmerston North
4440
4 The Square
Palmerston North 4410
Palmerston North
4410

Charity's other details

06 280 4471


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To encourage and assist development of the library in accordance with the library's purpose, which is to enrich the life of the community by actively and positively providing for the community's informational, educational, recreational, and cultural needs by promoting free and equal access to all library resources. To stimulate greater public support and use of the library and its services.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Supporting library

Education / training / research

Community development, Social services, Promotion of volunteering

General public

Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

An incorporated society administered by a committee elected at an annual general meeting of members.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

The first annual return due on the 31/08/2011 will cover less than six months after the charity is registered. For this reason the charity should be granted an exemption to filing their first annual return under s41 (1), and the first annual return will be due by the 31/08/2012.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 24/04/2018 $20 $20 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 16/05/2017 $30 $86 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 15/04/2016 $235 $779 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/09/2014 31/03/2015 20/01/2015 $1 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
28/09/2013 31/03/2014 5/12/2013 $143 $100 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
28/09/2012 31/03/2013 1/03/2013 $123 $127 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
27/02/2012 31/08/2012 28/08/2012 $83 $61 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Cherry Lynne Gordon Secretary 16/05/2017
Keith Stewart Birks Chair 6/03/2017
Margaret Stewart Harrex Committee Member 6/03/2017
Don Esslemont Committee Member 14/03/2016
Lawrence Alexander Haist Committee Member 1/12/2014

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Jacqueline Anne Aldridge-Sutton Committee Member 2/02/2018
Elizabeth Rhodes Chandler Chair 6/03/2017
Bruce Hoult Thomson Chair 14/03/2016
Elizabeth Rhodes Chandler Chair 14/03/2016
Don Esselmont Treasurer 1/12/2014
Midge Minot Secretary 1/12/2014
Stewart Harrex Chairperson 1/12/2014
Jacqueline (called Jill) Jill White Treasurer 17/10/2013

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
16/05/2017 NOC010
24/04/2016 NOC009
24/04/2016 NOC008
29/03/2015 NOC006
11/02/2015 NOC005
5/12/2013 NOC003
27/08/2012 AR001
22/08/2012 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.