pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


E Tipu E Rea Whānau Services
Thrive
CC45477
9429043212873
Registered

Registration details

3/10/2010
June 30
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Thrive Teen Parent Support Trust 4/10/2010
E Tipu E Rea Whanau Services 28/01/2020
E Tipu E Rea Whānau Services 25/03/2020

Address for service

PO Box 44005
Point Chevalier
Auckland
1246
247 Edmonton Road
1 Tony Street
Te Atatu South
Auckland
0610

Charity's other details

095514367
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/Etipuereaws
Twitter icon image
@ETipuEReaWhanau


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To promote the health and wellbeing of young people, young parents and young whānau and their tamariki of Maori descent or any ethnic origin, age, gender and or sexual orientation

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Work to strengthen and uplift young people, young parents and families.

Social services

Health, Community development, Youth Development

Family / whanau

Children / young people, Other charities

Entity Structure

Trust

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2020 18/02/2021 $400,914 $406,130
31/01/2020 18/12/2019 $454,664 $417,424
31/12/2018 30/12/2018 $455,701 $444,623
31/03/2018 7/02/2018 $414,563 $497,685
31/12/2016 18/10/2016 $418,306 $409,987
31/12/2015 1/12/2015 $410,995 $588,472
31/12/2014 28/01/2015 $690,862 $656,550
31/12/2013 30/01/2014 $676,529 $610,584
31/12/2012 30/10/2013 $412,005 $389,316

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Selah Maringi Hart Board Member 12/02/2021
Charlene Maree Fitisemanu Trustee 17/10/2019
Natalie Vincent Trustee 24/09/2019
Te Miria James-Hohaia Chair 29/01/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Josie Smith Trustee 21/07/2020
Dr Jade Le Grice Trustee 15/06/2020
Tina Barclay Trustee 14/10/2019
Wilson Irons Trustee 13/05/2019
Ngaire Ashmore Trustee 22/02/2016
Leigh Harris Secretary 29/01/2016
Ruth Kerr Trustee 31/08/2015
Carmel Sepuloni Board Member 4/09/2014
Maria Kekus Trustee 4/09/2014
Rochana Sheward Trustee 4/09/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
13/05/2021 NOC036
12/03/2021 NOC035
20/07/2020 NOC033
13/07/2020 NOC032
25/03/2020 NOC031
28/01/2020 NOC030
20/12/2019 NOC028
26/11/2019 NOC026
21/10/2019 NOC025
16/09/2019 NOC024

Charity Documents