Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Longbush Ecological Trust
CC45848
9429043190973
Registered

Registration details

12/7/2010
March 31

Address for service

14 Glen Road
Stanley Point
Auckland
0624
910 Riverside Road
Waimata 4071
Stanley Point
Waimata
4071

Charity's other details

06 281 0377
09 445 4111
https://www.facebook.com/groups/1078101225563873


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

the ecological restoration, management and enhancement of the covenanted lands at Longbush as a safe haven for endangered and other species of native plants and animals

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Organise educational and environmental projects designed to preserve and protect endangered native flora and fauna; and preserve, protect and restore streams and rivers)

Environment / conservation

Care / protection of animals

Children / young people

Animals, General public, endangered species of plants and animals

Entity Structure

The Longbush Ecological Trust is a wholly charitable not-for-profit non-trading entity

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 September 2011 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 September 2012.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
3/31/2024 9/30/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
3/31/2023 9/30/2023 7/27/2023 $235,928 $203,624 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
3/31/2022 9/30/2022 9/19/2022 $148,386 $144,637 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
3/31/2021 9/30/2021 6/7/2021 $156,819 $170,466 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
3/31/2020 9/30/2020 11/7/2020 $175,161 $118,643 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
3/31/2019 9/30/2019 11/28/2019 $134,393 $160,847 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
3/31/2018 9/30/2018 3/12/2019 $75,715 $94,786 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
3/31/2017 9/30/2017 9/30/2017 $131,587 $150,715 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
3/31/2016 9/30/2016 12/20/2016 $119,713 $152,415 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
3/31/2015 9/30/2015 9/29/2016 $277,474 $121,556 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Lois Margaret Easton trustee 5/30/2019
Stephen Jeremy John Salmond Trustee 2/12/2018
Timothy William Potiki Salmond Trustee 11/14/2016
Jennie Harré Hindmarsh Trustee 7/28/2014
Mary Anne Salmond Chairperson 3/12/2010

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Graham Jordan Atkins Trustee 9/14/2023
Laurence Jeremy Salmond Treasurer 1/3/2023
Stephen Leslie Sawyer Trustee 9/23/2019
Abigail Ruth Salmond Trustee 3/3/2019
Meikle Edwina Mcnab Secretary 4/1/2017
John Alan Thorpe Trustee 11/14/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
9/14/2023 NOC016
4/12/2021 NOC011
6/20/2019 NOC008
3/25/2018 NOC006
1/10/2017 NOC004
8/6/2014 NOC002
8/11/2012 AR001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.