Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Ara Taiohi Incorporated
Ara Taiohi
CC46022
9429043219438
Registered

Registration details

16/01/2011
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 11596
Manners Street
Te Aro
Wellington
6142
Floor 3, 148 Cuba Street
Goethe Institute
Te Aro
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

04 8025000
https://www.facebook.com/AraTaiohi/
https://instagram.com/arataiohi/


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To champion youth development and young people, advocating for those who work with rangatahi, and nurturing their capacity and capability.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Youth services

Community development

Education / training / research, Health, Social services, Promotion of volunteering

Children / young people

General public, Family / whanau

Legal Structure

Incorporated Society

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 10/11/2024 $2,328,751 $2,299,472 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 21/12/2023 $2,133,943 $2,119,843 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 13/12/2022 $2,173,212 $2,009,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 10/11/2021 $1,402,932 $1,231,200 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 7/12/2020 $866,659 $826,711 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 16/12/2019 $1,022,294 $912,519 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 27/11/2018 $485,115 $467,231 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 23/10/2017 $354,673 $401,923 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 17/11/2016 $474,030 $457,122 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 9/11/2015 $378,178 $368,919 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Anya Satyanand Board Member 15/10/2024
Atarau Hamilton Board Member 15/10/2024
Zoe Findlay Board Member 15/10/2024
Keith Shaw Board Member, Finance and Risk Committee Chair 1/08/2024
Moana Marie Matautia Magele Sae Tepania Board Member 17/10/2023
Chillion Sanerivi Co-Chair 2/12/2022
Raniera Pene Kaihautū/ Co-Chair 18/10/2022
Bethany Joy Walters Operations Manager 1/01/2021
Shirley Jane (Jane) Zintl Chief Executive Officer 3/09/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Annabel Prescott Board Member and Finance And Risk Committee Chair 15/10/2024
Briarley Joy Birch Board Member 15/10/2024
Christopher Mark Davidson Board Member 15/10/2024
Josie Samantha Ogden Schroeder Co-Chair 15/10/2024
Joshua Hamilton Tabor Board Member & Chair, Finance Audit and Risk Committee 17/10/2023
Karina Jewell Nepia Board Member 17/10/2023
Matekino Marshall Board Member/Kaihautu 18/10/2022
Matthew John Viliamu Board Member 18/10/2022
Morgan-Jean Te Hinu Raeika Butler Board Member 20/10/2020
Elizabeth Kerekere Board Member 22/10/2019
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
26/11/2024 NOC027
22/10/2024 NOC025
21/12/2022 NOC023
10/02/2020 NOC019
25/10/2019 NOC017
17/08/2018 NOC015
11/08/2017 NOC013
9/02/2017 NOC012
30/10/2015 NOC010
16/07/2015 NOC009
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.