Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Hill Street Early Childhood Centre Incorporated
CC46040
9429043031092
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Hill Street Early Childhood Centre 30/06/2008
Hill Street Early Childhood Centre Incorporated 2/09/2016

Address for service

66 Hill Street
Thorndon
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

04 4735 426


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Hill Street Early Childhood Centre provides full time Childcare Services for up to 25 Children. Our mission is to work collaboratively with our whanau to create optimal learning outcomes for children in a respectful and responsive environment. The objectives of the Incorporated Society are: a) to conduct, administer and maintain a non-profit early childhood education and care centre primarily for the use of working parents/caregivers and their children; and b) to provide quality early childhood education and care; meeting the needs of families using the centre.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Education / training / research

Children / young people

Family / whanau

Legal Structure

Incorporated Society

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 18/08/2024 $818,365 $808,980 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 17/08/2023 $736,958 $740,170 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 15/07/2022 $714,251 $663,732 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 18/08/2021 $743,550 $681,966 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 14/09/2020 $671,090 $661,892 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 22/08/2019 $634,238 $647,891 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 20/08/2018 $614,475 $625,613 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 14/08/2017 $614,210 $614,008 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 1/09/2016 $597,625 $569,097 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Ben Hehir Civil Defence, Health and Safety Officer 10/06/2024
Huimin Lin Committee Member 10/06/2024
Jesse Di Benedetto Committee Member 10/06/2024
Ashley Woods Assistant Head Teacher 19/06/2023
Gabrielle Wheddon Treasurer 19/06/2023
Juline Bunel Policy Officer and Grants/Fundraising Officer 19/06/2023
Peter Spencer Maintenance Officer 19/06/2023
Sarah Edmonson Secretary 13/06/2022
Gareth Matthew Richards Licensee + Chairperson 1/07/2021
Louise Foster Administrator 1/05/2018
loading image for pagination

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Bryony Jackson Secretary 10/06/2024
Craig Renney Committee Member 10/06/2024
Dane Curries Committee Member 10/06/2024
Dominic Davin Civil Defense Officer 10/06/2024
Joel Manu Cosgrove Parent Liaison 10/06/2024
Megan Figgest Staff Liaison 10/06/2024
Natalie Renney Committee Member 10/06/2024
Daniel Geoffrey Mercer O'Connor Chairperson 19/06/2023
Ella Hardy Grants Officer 19/06/2023
Jasmine Bourne Stratergy + Planning 19/06/2023
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
24/08/2023 NOC036
18/07/2022 NOC034
5/10/2020 NOC031
12/09/2020 NOC029
8/09/2020 NOC028
15/08/2019 NOC026
14/04/2019 NOC025
17/04/2018 NOC023
19/12/2017 NOC022
19/12/2017 NOC021
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.