Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Dunedin Prison Charitable Trust
Dunedin Gaol
CC46118
9429043196579
Registered

Registration details

6/02/2011
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 919
Dunedin Central
Dunedin
9054
2 Castle Street
Dunedin
9016

Charity's other details

02102734431


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To be guardians of the Dunedin Gaol's history and architecture, and to honour the building and its stories. To conserve, restore and revitalise the Dunedin Gaol in a sustainable manner.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Arts / culture / heritage

Arts/culture/heritage/education

General public

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 September 2011 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 September 2012.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 28/08/2024 $111,626 $67,116 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 12/08/2023 $147,209 $60,865 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 15/08/2022 $68,838 $52,599 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 22/09/2021 $644,455 $59,432 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 8/09/2020 $63,416 $42,504 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 20/08/2019 $72,077 $40,918 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 1/08/2018 $118,329 $51,156 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 8/07/2017 $331,058 $35,386 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 21/06/2016 $306,615 $48,616 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Teresa Jean Fogarty Trustee 30/09/2024
Emily Jane Wheeldon Trustee 29/01/2024
Norcombe Richard Barker Trustee 31/07/2023
Jane Michelle Adams Trustee 16/10/2019
Mark William Cubitt Trustee 16/10/2019
Virginia Nicholls Trustee 27/02/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Barry Peter Timmings Trustee 6/06/2024
Bronwyn Ellen Simes Trustee 31/03/2024
Victoria Jean Robertson Trustee 28/08/2023
Lindsay John Hall Trustee 31/03/2023
Michael Price Trustee 7/12/2021
Sarah Cross Trustee 2/08/2021
Owen John Graham Trustee and Treasurer 29/03/2021
William Benjamin Munro Trustee 23/02/2021
Francis William Robertson Trustee and Secretary 11/08/2019
Katherine Keddell Hesson Trustee 29/07/2019
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
23/11/2024 NOC038
11/04/2024 NOC036
2/04/2024 NOC035
30/08/2023 NOC034
16/02/2022 NOC031
15/12/2021 NOC030
26/11/2021 NOC029
26/11/2021 NOC028
20/11/2018 NOC023
8/12/2017 NOC021
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.