Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Auckland Sri Ganesh Temple Trust
CC46288
9429043032310
Registered

Registration details

6/03/2011
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 2721244
Papakura
2244
4 Dent Place
Red Hill
Papakura
2110

Charity's other details

021336322
auckland sri ganesh temple


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To propagate Hindu religion in NZ among those who profess Hinduism. To promote the religious spiritual and cultural welfare of the Hindu community in NZ. To celebrate Hindu festival in NZ as is prescribed in the Hindu scripture and rites. To invite Hindu theologians to give lectures on Hinduism. To conduct and facilitate Hindu marriage. To conduct religious language classes.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Education / training / research, Community development, Arts / culture / heritage, Fund-raising

People of a certain ethnic / racial origin

Children / young people, Older people, General public, Family / whanau, Religious groups

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 September 2011 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 September 2012.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 1/10/2024 $600,883 $483,164 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 24/09/2023 $572,164 $506,617 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 1/10/2022 $433,327 $390,361 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 28/09/2021 $474,831 $386,887 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 29/09/2020 $461,199 $430,390 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 29/09/2019 $434,951 $347,654 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/11/2018 18/11/2018 $410,794 $358,482 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 6/12/2017 $378,356 $370,512 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 27/09/2016 $565,463 $338,358 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
radhakrishnan nadarajah Life Trustee/Chairperson 3/10/2024
Rasamy Manikkam elected trustee 30/06/2024
jiten lal elected trustee 24/09/2023
Rammohan Danthala Life Trustee/treasurer 12/08/2017
Geetha Krishnan Secretary/Life Trustee 9/04/2011

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
balarajan rasiah Elected Trustee/Treasurer 30/04/2024
Rengiah Krishnan Chairman/Life Trustee 11/02/2024
pramkumar krishnan Life Trustee/Treasurer 3/02/2023
alfred anand naidu elected trustee 12/08/2017
Arunasalam Rengasamy Elected Trustee 6/10/2014
Suppammal Annamalai Secretary/Trustee 18/07/2014
Selvakumar Krishna Trustee 15/04/2014
Raman Annamalay Trustee 5/07/2011
Prabha Annamalay Trustee 25/06/2011

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
19/09/2018 NOC007
11/08/2016 NOC004
6/08/2015 NOC003
8/10/2012 AR001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.