Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Inspire Foundation
CC46337
9429043150281
Registered

Registration details

14/03/2011
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 13104
Armagh Street
Christchurch
8141
Level 3, 335 Lincoln Road
Addington
Christchurch
8024

Charity's other details

(03) 379 6710


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

1) To provide financial and non-financial assistance to young people in Canterbury & Marlborough aged between 15 and 23 years of age who demonstrate extraordinary talents and potential in the areas of Arts, IT, Design, Music, Science, Research, Education, Sport or Community Service. 2) Provide a source of funding for talented young people, regardless of their personal or family financial circumstance. 3) Provide a range of non-financial assistance including presentations, development training, mentoring and promotion. 4) Provide updates to members of the foundation about grantee progress, successes and achievements. 5) Maintain good systems and governance of the foundation. 6) Create a foundation model that can be replicated in any province in New Zealand. 7) Hold inspiring grantee award functions to recognise the talents of grantees with inspirational presentations and guest speakers. 8) Build a passionate network of members to help support grantees through donations, membership and n

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants / loans to individuals

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds)

Fund-raising

Education / training / research, Community development, Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation, science/technology

Children / young people

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 September 2011 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 September 2012.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 19/09/2024 $768,364 $401,817 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 23/10/2023 $455,879 $401,059 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 2/10/2022 $492,582 $227,704 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 29/09/2021 $785,562 $180,509 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 22/10/2020 $336,686 $232,934 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 26/11/2019 $499,333 $222,982 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 27/09/2018 $327,552 $203,575 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 15/02/2018 $384,266 $174,344 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 5/12/2016 $333,905 $184,557 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Riley Divett Trustee 31/03/2025
Mark Keith Allison Trustee 10/06/2011
Robert Neville Davison Trustee 10/06/2011
Jonathan Rodney Chell Wilson Trustee 16/12/2010
Paul Bertram Wright Trustee 16/12/2010

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Lyndal Dale Irvine Trustee 31/03/2025
Phillip John Gleeson Trustee 1/04/2019
Wayne Mark Davis Trustee 1/04/2019
Donald James Irvine Trustee 1/02/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
14/04/2025 NOC020
4/10/2022 NOC017
8/09/2022 NOC014
6/04/2018 NOC008
6/04/2018 NOC007
12/10/2017 NOC004
27/10/2011 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.