Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Pentecostal Missionary Church of Christ (4th Watch)
CC46365
9429043210756
Registered

Registration details

8/03/2011
March 31

Address for service

5C Matai Road
Greenlane
Auckland
1051
5A Earl Richardson Avenue
Wiri
Auckland
2104

Charity's other details

02108591270
https://www.facebook.com/PMCC4WAuckland

Oceania

Australia, Fiji, Papua New Guinea

Africa

Ivory Coast, Kenya, Madagascar, Mauritius

North America

Canada, Guatemala, Mexico, Panama, United States

Asia

Bahrain, Burma (Myanmar), Cambodia, India, Indonesia, Israel, Japan, Korea, South, Malaysia, Oman, Philippines, Qatar, Singapore, Thailand, Turkey, United Arab Emirates, Vietnam

Europe

France, Germany, Italy, Norway, Portugal, Spain, Sweden, Switzerland, United Kingdom


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The charity is extending help by means of emotional, physical and spiritual aspects to both newly arrived people and those who are already residing here.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Religious activities

General public

Family / whanau, Religious groups

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 September 2011 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 September 2012.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 30/09/2024 $166,246 $212,638 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 30/09/2023 $180,234 $407,664 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 30/09/2022 $3,024,798 $2,991,332 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 30/09/2021 $121,178 $118,373 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 30/09/2020 $147,275 $124,931 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 24/09/2019 $133,508 $124,039 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 26/09/2018 $82,738 $81,599 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 12/09/2017 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 21/09/2016 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Nempsie Asuncion Elder/Treasurer 1/11/2020
Mia Campus Secretary 8/01/2017
Manolo Campus President 8/03/2011

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Florigen Collo Minister 1/06/2020
Soledad Wilson Minister 3/03/2019

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
16/11/2020 NOC016
16/11/2020 NOC015
9/10/2020 NOC014
3/04/2019 NOC011
26/09/2018 NOC009
10/06/2015 NOC005
26/08/2013 NOC003
21/07/2013 AR002
17/08/2012 AR001
9/01/2012 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.