Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Sustainable Coastlines Charitable Trust
Sustainable Coastlines
CC46615
9429043208821
Registered

Registration details

23/05/2011
March 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Sustainable Coastlines Charitable Trust 24/05/2011
The Sustainable Coastlines Charitable Trust 20/12/2022

Address for service

55 Madden Street
Auckland Central
Auckland
1010

Charity's other details

021 823 380
https://www.facebook.com/sustainablecoastlines/
https://twitter.com/sustaincoasts
https://www.linkedin.com/company/sustainable-coastlines/about/

Oceania

Fiji, Samoa, Solomon Islands, Tonga, Vanuatu


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Established in March 2011, the Sustainable Coastlines Charitable Trust is a multi award-winning New Zealand charity that exists to reduce litter together. Our goal is for 60% less coastal litter by 2030. We inspire change in mindsets, behaviours, policies and practices, through community engagement and citizen science. With the scale of our vision, we cannot achieve this work alone. We deliver and support large-scale clean-up events, educational programmes, public awareness campaigns and citizen science environmental monitoring activities. We also enable others by supporting ‘Do It Yourself ’ efforts nationwide. Sustainable Coastlines is strictly apolitical and focuses on solutions for people of all ages, backgrounds and sectors.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Sponsors / undertakes research, Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Practical Learning

Environment / conservation

Education / training / research, Community development, Sport / recreation, Care / protection of animals, International activities, Promotion of volunteering, Sustainability

General public

Children / young people, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Animals

Entity Structure

Sustainable Coastlines operates as The Sustainable Coastlines Charitable Trust and is governed by a Board of Trustees who take ultimate responsibility for the trust. Operational responsibility is delegated to the CEO, who leads a team of experts to deliver our charitable purpose.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2023 31/10/2023 30/10/2023 $2,096,000 $2,647,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 20/12/2022 20/12/2022 $2,234,000 $2,444,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 28/09/2021 $2,231,000 $2,228,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 23/09/2020 $2,399,000 $2,181,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 30/09/2019 $1,780,964 $1,700,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 28/09/2018 $1,294,000 $1,305,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 31/01/2018 26/01/2018 $962,000 $733,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 26/01/2018 $656,000 $696,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2015 30/09/2015 28/12/2015 $538,637 $538,392 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2014 30/09/2014 17/11/2014 $434,199 $362,166 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Sam Judd Trustee 19/07/2023
Natasha Whiting Trustee 25/01/2023
Edwina Merito Trustee 2/05/2022
Fei Bian Goh Trustee 2/05/2022
Grant Biggar Vice Chairperson 6/04/2021

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Samantha Walmsley-Bartlett Chairperson 12/02/2024
Scott Campbell Trustee 12/02/2024
Abbie Reynolds Trustee 17/05/2023
Craig Fisher Trustee 30/06/2022
Emma Dent Chairman of the board 28/03/2022
Stuart Tane Potter Trustee 20/10/2021
Paul Stewart Trotter Trustee 17/06/2021
Alexander James Asher Trustee 24/02/2021
Hannah Kibblewhite Trustee 31/10/2017
Jane Alwyn Ward Trustee 31/10/2017
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
25/01/2024 NOC037
18/10/2023 NOC035
21/09/2023 NOC034
27/02/2023 NOC033
20/07/2022 NOC031
12/05/2022 NOC030
22/10/2021 NOC029
28/09/2021 NOC028
29/06/2021 NOC026
5/12/2020 NOC024
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.