Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Southern Canterbury Agricultural And Pastoral Association Incorporated
CC46863
9429049955248
Registered

Registration details

8/11/2011
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 153
Waimate
7960

Charity's other details

027 523 78 78
www.facebook.com/southerncanterburyshow


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To encourage and awareness of agriculture by holding an annual agricultural fair as well as trough other activities. To promote and enrich the quality of life of people in our community.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Community development

Sport / recreation, Care / protection of animals

General public

Children / young people, Animals

Entity Structure

There shall be an annual meeting of the Association held no later than August 31st. Twelve members shall form a quorum. Candidates for election to president, vice-president, junior vice-president, honorary treasurer and of the elected members of the community may be nominated up to 14 clear days immediately preceding the AGM.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
3/31/2024 9/30/2024 5/28/2024 $170,177 $221,352 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
3/31/2023 9/30/2023 5/25/2023 $230,358 $205,988 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
3/31/2022 9/30/2022 5/19/2022 $134,303 $166,901 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
3/31/2021 9/30/2021 5/31/2021 $154,619 $177,798 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
3/31/2020 9/30/2020 8/11/2020 $165,410 $196,309 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
3/31/2019 9/30/2019 7/29/2019 $156,243 $178,221 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
3/31/2018 9/30/2018 9/27/2018 $280,060 $197,306 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
3/31/2017 9/30/2017 6/29/2017 $121,364 $118,111 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
3/31/2016 9/30/2016 9/26/2016 $147,896 $147,146 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
3/31/2015 9/30/2015 5/19/2015 $148,564 $141,197 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Henry Studholme junior vice president 4/1/2023
David Studholme president 5/24/2021
Daniel Paul Studholme treasurer 5/27/2019
John Mehrtens vice president 3/31/2017
Reto Oswald manager 3/31/2013

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Hugh Wigley president 4/1/2023
Tim Merthens junior vice president 5/24/2021
James Davis president 6/24/2019
Kevin Laurence Cromie Trustee/Treasurer 5/27/2019
Daniel Paul Studholme president 3/31/2017
Arthur Charles Ruddenklau committee member 3/31/2016
Athol David Smith commitee member 3/31/2016
Timothy Lyndon Douglass committee member 3/31/2016
John Burnside Campbell Commiittee Member 10/31/2015
Karin Pearce Secretary 3/31/2013
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
7/29/2019 NOC007
6/3/2016 NOC003
8/21/2013 AR002
9/26/2012 AR001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.