Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Christchurch Stadium Trust
Christchurch Stadium
CC47229
9429043216512
Deregistered
03/12/2021

Financial information at the time of Deregistration:

$0
$0

Below are details of Christchurch Stadium Trust at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

9/01/2012
December 31

Registration history

Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 3/12/2021 The charity is closing down permanently or has closed down (winding up)
Registered 9/01/2012

Address for service

PO Box 42126
Tower Junction
Christchurch
8149
Christchurch Stadium
95 Jack Hinton Drive
Addington
Christchurch
8024

Charity's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Plan, develop, construct, own, operate and maintain Christchurch's temporary stadium as a high-quality, multi-purpose sporting and cultural venue on land the Trust has authority to occupy.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Sport / recreation

Community development, Emergency / disaster relief, Economic development

General public

Children / young people

Entity Structure

The Trust has no less than 5 and no more than 7 trustees. It contracts various entities to provide operational services to and at the stadium.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2020 31/08/2021 30/08/2021 $3,931,000 $1,496,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 31/08/2020 31/07/2020 $2,360,000 $2,470,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 30/03/2019 $2,233,000 $1,953,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 21/05/2018 $3,889,000 $2,202,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 4/04/2017 $4,049,000 $2,740,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 16/05/2016 $5,085,000 $5,002,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2014 30/06/2015 19/06/2015 $5,322,000 $6,067,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2013 30/06/2014 12/06/2014 $4,022,000 $10,382,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2012 30/06/2013 26/02/2014 $31,452,000 $9,023,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Lesley Murdoch Trustee 1/03/2019
Clayton Cosgrove Trustee 30/09/2018
David East Trustee 21/04/2017
John Filsell Trustee 5/02/2016
Lauren Semple Trustee 1/11/2012
Trevor Thornton Chair 10/02/2012
Neville Owen Harris Trustee 22/12/2011

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Tim Wood Trustee 31/10/2018
Jim Anderton Chair 31/10/2017
Michael Brian Aitken Trustee 18/12/2015
John William Hansen Chairperson 17/08/2012

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
12/04/2019 NOC015
31/03/2019 NOC012
3/11/2017 NOC010
20/07/2017 NOC009
5/10/2016 NOC006
5/10/2016 NOC005
13/09/2016 NOC004
30/10/2013 AR001
30/10/2013 NOC002
20/08/2013 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.