Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Freedom Centre
CC47342
9429043230273
Registered

Registration details

1/09/2011
March 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
NTM Family Worship Centres Trust (NZ) 1/09/2011
Freedom Centre 1/09/2021

Address for service

21/65 a Maleme Street
Greerton
Tauranga
3112

Charity's other details

0223902730
https://www.facebook.com/freedomcentre.nz


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Our mission is to lead people into an encounter with God, equip the saints for the work of the ministry and release them into their God Given purpose.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Social services

General public

Children / young people, Older people, Religious groups

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 8/11/2024 $1,306,662 $751,945 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 28/02/2023 17/02/2023 $584,281 $476,800 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 31/01/2022 13/02/2022 $396,431 $387,673 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/11/2020 3/01/2021 $349,330 $329,540 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/11/2019 25/11/2019 $268,897 $261,195 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 19/09/2018 $224,535 $203,008 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 9/07/2017 $208,448 $172,845 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 7/02/2017 $138,067 $106,001 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Gregory Lyle de Laborde Trustee 23/09/2023
Kaio Luka Robertson Trustee 1/01/2021
Peter Thomas Trustee 30/10/2017
Adem Guneyi Chairperson 21/12/2013

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Carla Teiwimate Trustee 25/11/2024
Alan Hood Trustee 6/08/2023
Nathan Lee Impala Trustee 7/08/2020
Stephen Alexander Ranno Trustee 21/10/2019
Francois Tenene Trustee 30/10/2017
Grace Guneyi trustee 1/02/2017
Dawn Ora Kota Trustee 24/06/2016
Denny Kota Trustee 24/06/2016
Bob Rezel Trustee 21/12/2013
Nikolas Eracleous Trustee 21/12/2013
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
28/11/2024 NOC026
25/09/2023 NOC023
4/10/2022 NOC021
14/06/2022 NOC020
17/08/2021 NOC018
30/07/2020 NOC015
14/07/2020 NOC014
27/04/2020 NOC013
8/05/2017 NOC009
6/04/2016 NOC007
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.