Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Fonua Ola Trust
Fonua Ola Network, Auckland Pasifika Providers Family Violence Prevention Network Trust
CC47471
9429043101207
Registered

Registration details

8/11/2011
June 30

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Fonua Ola Network 8/11/2011
Fonua Ola Trust 24/04/2025

Address for service

PO Box 22037
Otahuhu
Auckland
1640
32 Station Road
Otahuhu
Auckland
1062

Charity's other details

09 270 2089
https://www.facebook.com/fonuaola


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To ensure the delivery of responsive, quality assured, essential social and primary mental health and addiction services to support Pacific vulnerable children, young people and families. Through the relief of poverty, building of resilience, self-sufficiency and advancement of education by cultural connection that is beneficial to community.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Social services

Education / training / research, Health, Community development

Children / young people

Other charities, Older people, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees, Vulnerable women and children

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/03/2025 29/03/2025 $4,726,525 $4,481,765 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2023 31/03/2024 15/04/2024 $4,135,754 $3,623,526 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 18/04/2023 21/04/2023 $3,390,209 $2,474,735 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2022 $2,265,461 $1,385,803 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 29/12/2020 $1,437,897 $1,215,390 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 30/12/2019 $1,189,903 $1,149,234 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 28/12/2018 $1,050,048 $1,038,353 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 21/12/2017 $1,054,717 $1,119,790 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 10/05/2017 $1,366,125 $1,223,642 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 21/01/2016 $764,186 $913,258 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Katerina Solomona Taumaoe Chairperson 10/02/2020
Matthew Iakobo Crooks Treasurer 16/12/2019
Sione Tuamelie Taunga Vice -Chairperson 16/12/2019
Manase Lua Trustee 10/05/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Staverton Konrad Kautoke Trustee 13/05/2024
Epenesa Olo- Whaanga Chairperson 5/11/2023
Hamish Crooks Trustee 16/12/2019
Sandra Alofivae Trustee 16/12/2019
Sao Timaloa Trustee 13/03/2017
Wesley Talaimanu Trustee 18/01/2016
Mark Gosche Trustee 15/12/2015
Eseta Finau Vice Chairperson 14/09/2015
Anastasia Iosi Trustee 14/09/2012
Brenda Simmons Vui-talitu Vice Chairperson 14/09/2012
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
23/04/2025 NOC023
24/06/2024 NOC021
4/12/2020 NOC016
4/12/2020 NOC015
23/01/2020 NOC014
14/12/2019 NOC011
22/12/2017 NOC009
21/12/2017 NOC007
13/05/2017 NOC006
10/05/2017 NOC005
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.