pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Kiwi Community Assistance Charitable Trust
KCA
CC47974
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/05/2012
March 31

Address for service

5 Peterhouse Street
Tawa
Wellington
5028

Charity's other details

022 465 2201
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/kiwicommunityassistance
https://givealittle.co.nz/donate/org/kca


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Kiwi Community Assistance (KCA) is a registered charity based in Tawa & Grenada North, Wellington that is run largely by volunteers. As a distribution hub to local schools, foodbanks and other charities we provide fresh produce, non perishable food, clothing, books, toys, through to household goods including furniture and whiteware to families in need in communities throughout the Greater Wellington region.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy

Social services

Health, Community development, Fund-raising, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering

Other charities

Children / young people, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, General public, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

Volunteers report to team leader/co-ordinator Team leaders report to Operations Manager/CEO CEO reports to Board

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2023 25/09/2023 $389,515 $354,154
30/09/2022 29/08/2022 $346,127 $260,651
30/09/2021 18/09/2021 $327,230 $229,917
30/09/2020 16/09/2020 $130,766 $92,905
30/09/2019 24/08/2019 $74,370 $76,152
30/09/2018 13/06/2018 $73,947 $59,364
30/09/2017 11/05/2017 $103,223 $79,795
30/09/2016 2/08/2016 $51,448 $55,933
30/09/2015 13/05/2015 $92,158 $69,231
30/06/2014 23/04/2014 $52,300 $8,675

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Justin Donald Howe Board Member 1/03/2023
Victoria Jane Deaker Board member 7/09/2020
João Amarinho Gonçalves Angélica Board member 25/08/2020
Tracey Reid Treasurer 22/02/2014
Philip William Davies Trustee 30/05/2012
Tracy Ann Wellington Trustee 30/05/2012

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Lisa McLernon Officer - Fundraising 27/10/2020
Sajin Joseph Fundraising 26/08/2020
Hannah Smith Fundraising 31/05/2020
Tyler Kenton Dunkel Officer 30/09/2017
Anna Louise Pollitt Board Member 1/04/2017
Lynda Arbuckle Board Member 1/07/2013

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
15/02/2023 NOC026
27/10/2020 NOC023
26/08/2020 NOC021
26/08/2020 NOC020
25/08/2020 NOC019
18/02/2020 NOC017
18/02/2020 NOC016
4/10/2017 NOC013
15/04/2017 NOC011
15/04/2017 NOC010

Charity Documents