pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Kiwi Trust
Kiwis for kiwi
CC47976
9429043233014
Registered

Registration details

27/04/2012
June 30

Address for service

Private Bag 93504
Takapuna
Auckland
0740
68-76 Taharoto Road
Takapuna
Auckland
0622

Charity's other details

09 307 4878
Facebook icon image
www.facebook.com/kiwisforkiwi/
Twitter icon image
www.twitter.com/kiwisforkiwi


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

VISION From endangered to everywhere MISSION To enable kiwi to flourish in their natural habitat forever by supporting kiwi conservation

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides advice / information / advocacy

Environment / conservation

Care / protection of animals

Animals

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities

Entity Structure

Administration by Board of Trustees The trust shall be administered by a Board comprising the Trustees. The Board of Trustee will be responsible for furthering the objectives of the Trust and for declaring general policy relating to the implementation of the objectives of the Trust. The Trustees may appoint an Executive Director. The Executive Director will oversee the day to day operations and management of the Trust, subject to the ultimate direction and control of trustees.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2021 26/10/2021 $7,255,677 $6,521,637
31/12/2020 9/11/2020 $2,444,314 $2,576,361
31/12/2019 7/10/2019 $1,853,154 $1,977,373
31/12/2018 30/10/2018 $1,657,952 $1,565,222
31/12/2017 9/11/2017 $1,665,861 $1,398,741
31/12/2016 6/12/2016 $1,195,109 $1,005,026
31/12/2015 21/10/2015 $894,734 $810,837
31/12/2014 25/08/2014 $638,936 $760,076
31/12/2013 11/09/2013 $695,042 $640,389
31/12/2012 15/11/2012 $0 $0

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Alistair Bruce Ryan Trustee 1/09/2021
Henry John Brandts-Giesen Trustee 1/02/2021
Jennifer Ann Fenwick Trustee 1/01/2021
Richard Leggat Executive Chair 1/04/2019
Kate Graeme Trustee 23/02/2018
Rudolf Hendrik Kleinpastle Trustee 5/09/2011

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Evan Christopher Williams Trustee 30/09/2021
Peter Damien Cullinane Trustee 30/09/2021
John Alexander McLennan Trustee 31/05/2021
Timothy John MacAvoy Trustee 30/06/2020
Robert George Mappin Fenwick Trustee 1/04/2019
Sunil Kumar Unka Trustee 21/11/2017
Graham Wall Trustee 28/02/2017
Lou Sanson Trustee 28/02/2017
Rangimarie Hunia Trustee 28/02/2017
Graham Wall Advisory Trustee 29/02/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
26/10/2021 NOC028
20/09/2021 NOC027
6/09/2021 NOC026
28/07/2021 NOC025
2/04/2019 NOC022
1/04/2019 NOC021
6/11/2018 NOC019
17/09/2018 NOC017
18/05/2018 NOC016
2/02/2018 NOC015

Charity Documents