Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Adullam Humanitarian Aid Trust
BREAD NZ
CC48026
9429043318346
Registered

Registration details

17/07/2012
March 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Barnabas Aid For Syria Trust 17/07/2012
Adullam Humanitarian Aid Trust 17/12/2013

Address for service

PO Box 276018
Manukau City
Auckland
2241
20 Amersham Way
Manukau
Auckland
2104

Charity's other details

09 280 4385

Oceania

Fiji, Papua New Guinea, Samoa, Solomon Islands, Tonga, Tuvalu

Africa

Algeria, Angola, Botswana, Central African Republic, Congo, Democratic Republic of, Egypt, Ethiopia, Ivory Coast, Kenya, Libya, Madagascar, Malawi, Morocco, Namibia, Nigeria, Rwanda, Sierra Leone, Somalia, South Africa, South Sudan, Sudan, Tanzania, Tunisia, Uganda, Zambia, Zimbabwe

South America

Colombia, Ecuador, Guyana, Suriname, Venezuela

North America

Canada, Cuba, Dominica, Dominican Republic, Guatemala, Haiti, Honduras, Jamaica, Mexico, Trinidad and Tobago, United States

Asia

Afghanistan, Bangladesh, Brunei, Burma (Myanmar), Cambodia, China, East Timor, India, Indonesia, Iran, Iraq, Israel, Jordan, Kazakhstan, Kuwait, Kyrgyzstan, Lebanon, Malaysia, Maldives, Mongolia, Nepal, Oman, Pakistan, Philippines, Qatar, Russian Federation, Saudi Arabia, Singapore, Sri Lanka, Syria, Tajikistan, Thailand, Turkey, Turkmenistan, United Arab Emirates, Uzbekistan, Vietnam, Yemen

Europe

Albania, Armenia, Azerbaijan, Belarus, Bosnia and Herzegovina, Bulgaria, Croatia, Cyprus, Moldova, Serbia, Slovakia, Ukraine, United Kingdom


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide humanitarian aid, relief and encouragement to minorities suffering persecution oppression and discrimination in any part of the world.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants / loans to individuals

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Activity broadened beyond Syria means of distribution defined

Emergency / disaster relief

Fund-raising, Operation broadened beyond Syria

Other (please state)

(Minorities caught up in drought and other climatic problems in East Africa.)

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 30/09/2024 $2,239 $1,700 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 26/06/2023 $2,210 $2,200 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 9/08/2022 $3,001 $3,510 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 22/04/2021 $501 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 11/09/2020 $4,525 $4,500 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 1/10/2019 $4,500 $24,566 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/11/2018 2/11/2018 $20,155 $15,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 30/11/2017 $15,200 $10,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 24/10/2017 $18,457 $8,066 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Patrick Sookhdeo Chairperson 17/02/2023
Caroline Julia Chenevix Kerslake trustee 1/02/2023
Rosemary Anne Sookhdeo trustee 1/02/2023
Michael Hewat Trustee 10/08/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Peter Donald McKenzie Trustee 1/02/2023
Richard Wilfred Print Trustee 1/02/2023
Ian Grant Bourne Trustee 30/09/2015
Rosalynne Claire Molloy Trustee 30/09/2015
Simon Jonathan Smelt Trustee 16/08/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
20/06/2024 NOC019
26/09/2023 NOC018
26/06/2023 NOC016
23/03/2023 NOC015
4/09/2020 NOC011
24/06/2020 NOC010
24/06/2020 NOC009
7/11/2016 NOC003
1/09/2015 NOC002
14/01/2014 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.