Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Satsang Foundation New Zealand
The Satsang Foundation NZ
CC48083
N/A
Registered

Registration details

2/07/2012
March 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Vyasa Association of New Zealand 2/07/2012
Satsang Foundation NZ 14/06/2021
Satsang Foundation New Zealand 15/06/2021
The Satsang Foundation New Zealand 7/07/2021

Address for service

17 Exploration Way
Whitby
Porirua
5024

Charity's other details



Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Provide healthy life style alternatives for New Zealanders using Yoga, Yoga therapy and meditation techniques.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides advice / information / advocacy

Education / training / research

General public

Children / young people, Older people, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Organisation mainly run by volunteers through regular yoga, yoga therapy and meditation classes in community centres.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 24/09/2023 $22,039 $13,081 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 24/09/2022 $3,908 $1,973 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 28/08/2021 $3,438 $1,529 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 21/09/2020 $7,675 $5,092 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 14/08/2019 $5,196 $2,604 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 22/09/2018 $4,238 $1,519 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 4/07/2017 $4,462 $2,471 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 21/11/2016 $4,850 $5,984 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2015 30/09/2015 29/09/2015 $1,928 $720 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Chandrasekharaiah Naga Bhushan Nominee of Satsang Foundation India 15/06/2021
Latha Vasan Medical Advisor 15/06/2021
Mahender Borana Nominee of Satsang Foundation India 15/06/2021
Mumtaz Ali President 14/06/2021
Virupakshappa Aralikatte Secretary 14/06/2021
Ramkumar Bharadwaj Vice President 1/03/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Satish Rajkumar Treasurer 15/08/2023
Naena Chima Committee Member 28/03/2021
Sridharan Thiagarajan Committee Member 5/11/2019
Kamkumar Bharadwat Chairperson 1/01/2017
Shiva Kumar Committee Member 1/09/2014
Arvind Vijayraghavan Committee Member 26/06/2012
Ram Bharadwaj Chairman 26/06/2012

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
7/07/2021 NOC012
7/07/2021 NOC011
29/06/2021 NOC010
15/06/2021 NOC009
14/06/2021 NOC007
10/05/2021 NOC006

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.