Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Playhouse Theatre Incorporated
PTI
CC48229
9429042814603
Registered

Registration details

20/02/2012
December 31

Address for service

67 Glengarry Road
Glen Eden
Auckland
0602
15 Glendale Road
Glen Eden
Auckland
602

Charity's other details

0224288784
www.facebook.com/playhousetheatreinc/?ref=bookmarks
www.instagram.com/playhousetheatre/


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Our Vison: celebrating dynamic, vibrant, successful theatre Our Mission: to provide an opportunity for creative, aspirational theatre in an inclusive and welcoming environment We value : integrity- success- commitment- identity Definitions: Integrity Safety, trust and respect & credibilty Success Happy members, volunteers sharing a stable and secure theatre club Commitment To support our community with dedication and pride; valuing diversity Identity An inclusive environ

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Training and Theatre/Theatrical Production)

Arts / culture / heritage

Education / training / research, Sport / recreation, Fund-raising

General public

Children / young people, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, Members

Entity Structure

Our management team exists : President, Vice President, Secretary, Treasurer and up to 8 team members on the committee. This committee represents the members of the club and our purpose is to provide theatrical opportunity and training.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2023 31/08/2024 30/08/2024 $147,958 $120,041 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 29/06/2023 $164,508 $103,775 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 5/05/2022 $109,648 $55,028 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 10/05/2021 $1,632 $8,271 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 8/07/2020 $76,677 $76,335 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 4/04/2019 $78,892 $60,056 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 21/05/2018 $64,432 $76,014 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 30/03/2017 $67,993 $71,387 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 18/05/2016 $78,670 $83,318 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2014 30/06/2015 4/05/2015 $49,789 $50,963 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Alex Lane Committee Member 18/03/2023
Heidi Schuler Committee Member 18/03/2023
Henry Prince Committee Member 18/03/2023
Paul Jones Committee Member 18/03/2023
Samantha Jane Tara Higgins Treasurer 18/03/2023
Lily Pearce Vice President 27/03/2021
Tracey Lane Committee Member 2/02/2020
Yvonne MacKinnon Committee Member 15/05/2019
Kirsty Schuler President 11/06/2018
Simon Julius Secretary 12/03/2017
loading image for pagination

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Joshua William Committee Member 18/03/2023
Keaton Pronk Master of Coin | Treasurer 18/03/2023
Oliver Prince Committee Member 18/03/2023
Pauline Margaret VElla Committee Member 13/04/2021
Matt Billington Committee Member 27/03/2021
Sammie Campbell Committee Member 11/11/2019
Robin Lane Committee Member 13/06/2019
Craig Wilkinson Committee Member 30/03/2019
James Grant Committee Member 7/11/2018
Kim Wilkinson Committee Member 11/06/2018
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
21/05/2018 NOC013
21/05/2018 NOC011
29/03/2017 NOC009
18/05/2016 NOC008
18/05/2016 NOC007
7/02/2016 NOC006
7/02/2016 NOC005
4/05/2015 NOC004
2/02/2015 NOC003
4/07/2014 NOC002
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.