pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Methodist Church Of New Zealand Te Haahi Weteriana O Aotearoa Christchurch Central Parish - Parish
CC48261
N/A
Registered

Registration details

20/08/2012
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 931
Christchurch
8140
309 Durham Street North
Christchurch Central
Christchurch
8013

Charity's other details

03 366 6049


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Within the Methodist Church Te Haahi Weteriana O Aotearoa, the parish is a visible expression of the body of Christ in a particular place.  It consists of one or more congregations of members who worship and witness as the people called Methodist.  A parish may be in co-operation with another church or churches. 

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Social services

General public

Children / young people, Older people, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees, Religious groups

Entity Structure

The day to day running of the parish is governed by the Laws and Regulations of the Methodist Church Te Haahi Weteriana O Aotearoa with Section 3 dealing with parishes.A parish can consist of one or more congregations.The parish officers are the Chairperson, Secretary and Treasurer (who are appointed annually by the parish meeting) and the parish Stewards.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2022 28/11/2022 $441,272 $530,899
31/12/2021 1/12/2021 $501,160 $380,430
31/12/2020 22/11/2020 $4,482,893 $321,924
31/12/2019 27/11/2019 $264,705 $220,083
31/12/2018 10/12/2018 $384,210 $188,639
31/12/2017 6/12/2017 $383,216 $196,243
31/12/2016 1/12/2016 $344,231 $129,492
31/12/2015 10/11/2015 $317,816 $116,167
31/12/2014 16/11/2014 $7,703,770 $488,317
31/12/2013 16/12/2013 $110,751 $111,589

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Garth Warren Nowland-Foreman Parish Steward 30/06/2021
Lucy Joy Hughes D'Aeth Chair / Secretary 30/06/2021
Hugh Francis Mingard Treasurer 1/10/2020
Pauline Florence McKay Parish Steward 30/11/2016
David Leslie Lloyd Peach Property Steward 11/10/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Judith Mary Prosser Secretary 30/06/2021
Susanne Margaret Spindler Parish Steward 30/06/2021
Terrence Charles Reid Chair 30/06/2021
Valerie Laura Marshall Parish Steward 30/06/2021
Allan Staite Parish Steward 24/11/2019
Andrew David Donaldson Parish Superintendent 31/01/2017
Digby Stephen Prosser Parish Steward 6/11/2016
Lorraine May Goffin Presbyter's Steward 25/11/2012

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
5/12/2016 NOC009
5/07/2016 NOC007
17/06/2016 NOC004
17/06/2016 NOC003
17/11/2014 NOC002
3/12/2012 AR001

Charity Documents