Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Rei Foundation Limited
CC48299
9429030633001
Registered

Registration details

5/07/2012
March 31

Address for service

13/143 Quay Street
Auckland Central
Auckland
1010

Charity's other details

+64 9 309 0463

Oceania

Tonga

Africa

Malawi

Asia

Cambodia, Japan


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Company has been incorporated exclusively for charitable purposes for the support of people in developing and developed countries. Carry on charitable and educational work in developing and developed countries.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Sponsors / undertakes research

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Education / training / research

Social services, Arts / culture / heritage, Economic development

People of a certain ethnic / racial origin

Children / young people, People with disabilities

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 24/09/2024 $2,401,871 $1,963,876 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 28/09/2023 $960,654 $3,846,110 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 29/09/2022 $966,773 $2,612,177 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 29/09/2021 $2,709,919 $1,194,795 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 30/09/2020 $1,035,874 $2,452,305 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 30/09/2019 $2,500,163 $1,600,435 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 6/09/2018 $2,128,466 $1,337,267 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 30/10/2017 $1,030,270 $1,116,653 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 25/09/2016 $2,307,370 $606,175 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Geeta Sethi Advisory Board Member 30/09/2013
Reiko Fukutake Director 29/06/2012

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Masayoshi Tarui Advisory Board Member 19/01/2024
Shizuka Arao Advisory Board Member 30/09/2013

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
23/04/2024 NOC018
15/09/2014 NOC008
15/09/2014 NOC007
15/01/2014 NOC006
18/12/2013 NOC005
26/09/2013 NOC002
11/09/2013 AR001
21/03/2013 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.