Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


InsideOUT Kōaro
CC48531
9429043326136
Registered

Registration details

10/18/2012
June 30

Name change history

Name Effective Date
QSA Network Aotearoa 10/18/2012
InsideOUT Kōaro 5/14/2015

Address for service

Level 3, Anvil House
138 Wakefield Street
Te Aro
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

https://facebook.com/insideoutkoaro
https://twitter.com/insideoutkoaro
https://instagram.com/insideoutkoaro


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Our Vision: All rainbow young people in Aotearoa New Zealand have a sense of safety and belonging in their schools and communities.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Other (please state)

(Rainbow/LGBTQIA+ young people)

Children / young people

Voluntary bodies other than charities, General public, Queer youth and allies

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Rainbow Violence Prevention Network (Non-Registered Entity) N/A

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
6/30/2023 6/14/2024 5/23/2024 $1,606,004 $1,414,972 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
6/30/2022 3/31/2023 4/18/2023 $1,184,424 $1,022,707 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
3/31/2021 2/28/2022 3/24/2022 $363,781 $318,701 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
3/31/2020 12/31/2020 12/2/2020 $347,146 $235,390 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
3/31/2019 9/30/2019 10/1/2019 $124,885 $116,081 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
3/31/2018 9/30/2018 9/30/2018 $129,327 $138,112 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
3/31/2017 9/30/2017 9/30/2017 $116,535 $99,095 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
3/31/2016 9/30/2016 9/28/2016 $76,103 $42,574 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
3/31/2015 9/30/2015 9/26/2015 $28,975 $21,889 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
3/31/2014 9/30/2014 9/29/2014 $26,303 $10,827 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination
= Balance Date Change
- This Annual Return will cover 15 months from 1 April 2021 to 30 June 2022.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Amy Ross Executive Advisor 3/26/2024
Jack Ruddenklau Trustee 3/26/2024
Juan Cleghorn Trustee 3/26/2024
Natalie McDonald Trustee 3/26/2024
Kaela Mary Stodart Secretary 9/26/2023
Maddison Anderson Trustee 9/26/2023
Tabitha Besley Managing Director 9/26/2023
Ilana Seager van Dyk Executive Advisor 7/25/2023
Shiyi Redpath Executive Advisor 7/25/2023
Kiefer Hunt Treasurer 10/25/2022
loading image for pagination

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Cameron Kapua-Morrell Trustee 3/26/2024
Becca Harvey Executive Advisor 12/19/2023
Rox Soriano Trustee 12/19/2023
Willow Bailey Trustee 11/28/2023
Tayla Dickinson Trustee 7/25/2023
Dany Miller-Kareko Trustee 5/30/2023
Julia de Bres Executive Advisor 4/18/2023
Stella Ivory Trustee 10/25/2022
Allanah Elvy-Arnold Executive Advisor 3/29/2022
Rosie Melchers Trustee 12/16/2021
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
10/20/2023 NOC041
10/11/2023 NOC040
4/18/2023 NOC039
3/22/2023 NOC037
4/19/2022 NOC036
3/24/2022 NOC035
2/24/2022 NOC033
12/3/2021 NOC032
8/29/2021 NOC031
7/22/2021 NOC030
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.