Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Dry July NZ Trust
CC48599
9429043265534
Registered

Registration details

12/11/2012
March 31

Address for service

42 Kerkwall Drive
Naenae
Lower Hutt
5011

Charity's other details

+61 2 9247 6691
www.facebook.com/dryjulynz
@dryjulynz


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Trust aims to raise money through donations and redistribute these funds by way of Grants to support other charitable organisations with its mission of improving the wellbeing of adult cancer patients and their families.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Fund-raising

Health, Community development

Other (please state)

(People affected by cancer and their families.For FY 2020 period, Dry July New Zealand Trust resolved that the monies rasied would be made to the national charity Look Good Feel Better.)

Entity Structure

The Trust's operations are managed by a Trust Board which overseas the day to day operation of the Trust. The Trust Board is overseen by the Trust Chairman.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2023 31/10/2023 18/10/2023 $1,442,513 $1,493,329 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 21/10/2022 $1,878,183 $1,785,806 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 31/12/2021 23/12/2021 $1,179,291 $1,142,623 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 20/08/2020 $1,274,421 $1,223,925 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 27/06/2019 $653,929 $637,152 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 30/08/2018 $405,779 $412,391 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 31/08/2017 $330,991 $332,632 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 3/11/2016 $428,274 $481,006 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2015 30/09/2015 6/08/2015 $751,878 $1,176,351 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2014 30/09/2014 14/09/2014 $772,364 $218,158 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Lynley Margaret Belton Trustee 27/10/2023
Stephen George Bardwell Trustee 31/08/2023
Ian Elliot Chairperson 17/02/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Graeme John Dennis Trustee 31/08/2023
Scott Anthony Abraham Trustee 23/08/2023
Brett Dean Macdonald Trustee 30/06/2020
Kenneth George McGilvary Trustee 30/06/2020
Philip Michael Grove Trustee 1/12/2017
Philip Michael Grove Trustee 26/11/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
30/10/2023 NOC019
11/09/2023 NOC017
9/12/2019 NOC013
28/12/2017 NOC010
20/01/2017 NOC008
8/07/2016 NOC006
16/02/2015 NOC005
30/01/2015 NOC004
26/11/2014 NOC003
30/09/2013 AR001
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.