pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Greening the Rubble Trust
The Green Lab
CC48786
N/A
Registered

Registration details

4/02/2013
June 30

Address for service

39 Nursery Road
Phillipstown
Christchurch
8011

Charity's other details

03 3379764


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Greening the Rubble’s core purpose is to reduce social isolation, encourage community participation and engagement, and improve people’s well-being through public green spaces.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Temp public spaces

Environment / conservation

Education / training / research, Health, Community development, Arts / culture / heritage, Promotion of volunteering, Earthquake recovery

General public

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

Our Trust Deed states that we must have at least three Trustees. We currently have three Trustees that constitute our governance board, including three executive officer positions: chair, treasurer and secretary. Trustees/governance members may lead sub-committees as determined by our annual work plan and priorities.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/01/2022 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2020 3/02/2021 $156,478 $154,770
31/01/2020 3/02/2021 $175,907 $184,019
31/12/2018 4/02/2019 $190,250 $192,019
31/12/2017 16/09/2019 $180,804 $164,292
31/12/2016 25/01/2017 $140,105 $137,572
31/12/2015 19/01/2016 $132,696 $122,302
31/12/2014 18/12/2014 $143,982 $142,575
31/12/2013 19/12/2013 $123,250 $100,668

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Paul Rowe Board 1/09/2021
Alexander Davis Board 26/05/2021
Karen Long Chair 26/05/2021
Layling Stanbury Board 26/05/2021
Liam O'Shea Treasurer 26/05/2021
Sera Lee Sue Xin Board 26/05/2021
Tom Morrison Board 26/05/2021
Duncan Graham Sloss Trustee 25/01/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Karen Charlotte Margaret Sanderson Board Chair 20/09/2021
Henriette Nass Secretary 9/07/2021
Robert James Miller Treasurer 26/05/2021
Jessica Schuhmacher Trustee 6/07/2020
Leon Geoffrey Mooney Trustee 1/03/2020
Christopher McAllum Davis Trustee 5/08/2019
Wendy Rosalie Hoddinott Chair/Trustee 30/07/2018
Simon Gurnsey Secretary/Trustee 23/05/2018
Sarah Mankelow Officer 30/06/2017
Suzanne Vallance Secretary/Trustee 30/06/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
17/11/2021 NOC027
16/11/2021 NOC026
13/05/2021 NOC025
2/03/2021 NOC024
4/08/2020 NOC021
11/11/2019 NOC020
30/09/2019 NOC019
9/07/2019 NOC017
19/06/2019 NOC016
17/06/2019 NOC015

Charity Documents