Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Far North Radio and Sea Rescue Incorporated
CC49018
9429043050659
Registered

Registration details

21/03/2013
June 30

Address for service

409B Cable Bay Block Road
Cable Bay
0420

Charity's other details

09-4061423


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Far North Radio and Sea Rescue Inc is based in Doubtless Bay is a private coast watch station providing a vital marine radio service over an area that covers from Whangaroa on the east coast to Hokianga on the west coast including the three kings Islands. We have our own dedicated rescue vessels as a 9.6 metre naiad and a Jet ski

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Provides Marine Radio Services & Rescue Vessel), Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Emergency / disaster relief

General public

Entity Structure

We are structured by dedicated volunteers. A President, Secretary Treasurer along with Board Members.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 18/09/2024 $40,775 $47,538 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 24/08/2023 $56,683 $39,675 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 25/11/2022 $54,061 $43,240 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 2/11/2021 $75,089 $47,023 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 14/10/2020 $46,668 $39,491 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 11/12/2019 $16,158 $18,705 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 12/10/2018 $58,983 $43,173 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 25/09/2017 $58,983 $43,173 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 6/11/2016 $62,105 $34,576 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 21/09/2015 $20,987 $36,101 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Michael John Webber Board Member 28/09/2016
Edward Nicolson Gaston Treasurer 29/09/2015
Hamish William Wilton Vice President 29/09/2015
Timothy Ray Murdock Board Member 29/09/2015
Annette Hall President 28/08/2007

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Kerry June Gaston Secretary 24/11/2017
Anthony Banks Board Trustee 29/08/2017
Elizabeth Bezuidenhoult Board Member 29/08/2017
Janiece Beaver Treasurer 29/08/2017
Stephen Bezuidenhoult Board Member 29/08/2017
Timothy Murdock Board Member 29/08/2017
John Payne Board Member 1/06/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
29/04/2021 NOC007
25/09/2017 NOC003

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.