Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Tairawhiti Technology Trust
Tairawhiti Computer Hubs Trust
CC49177
9429043324873
Registered

Registration details

9/03/2013
March 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Tairawhiti Computer Hubs Trust 9/03/2013
Tairawhiti Technology Trust 22/09/2014

Address for service

11 Richardson Avenue
Whataupoko
Gisborne
4010
Kaiti Hub
502 Wainui Road
Kaiti
Gisborne
4010

Charity's other details

0212582474
https://www.facebook.com/TairawhitiTechnologyTrust/?ref=aymt_homepage_panel


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

Focuses on outcomes for Māori

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The purpose for which this Trust has been established is to carry out charitable purposes in the Tairawhiti Region as follows: 4.1.1 To educate and empower people in the Tairawhiti Region to become capable, creative and confident life-long learners, creators and innovators; 4.1.2 To operate technology-based learning facilities in the Tairawhiti Region; 4.1.3 To foster the growth of learning communities, especially amongst sectors of the people of the Tairawhiti Region with limited access to new and emerging technology; 4.1.4 To encourage the residents of the Tairawhiti Region to link cultural knowledge and values with technology; 4.1.5 To foster entrepreneurship and employment opportunities through technology; 4.1.6 To engage in any other educational activity or educational purpose that in the sole, absolute and unfettered discretion of the Trustees is likely to directly or indirectly relate to, or advance, or benefit the people of the Tairawhiti Region.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space, Computer training

Education / training / research

Community development, Employment

General public

Children / young people, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, Migrants / refugees

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 18/08/2024 $234,068 $258,919 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 2/08/2023 $269,843 $261,895 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 8/09/2022 $123,589 $111,220 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 29/09/2021 $126,034 $103,915 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 8/09/2020 $3,163 $52,330 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 29/05/2019 $66,548 $6,335 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 27/09/2018 $14,473 $14,183 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 31/10/2017 $15,304 $6,291 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 28/12/2016 $97,357 $90,702 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Mark Aaron Lucas Trustee 16/01/2024
Helena-Anne Mill Trustee, Secretary 7/08/2019
Carolyn Dawn Carpendale Trustee, Chairperson, co-Treasurer 29/08/2018
Tahui (Polly) Crawford Trustee, Operations Manager 26/07/2017
Leslie Maurice Alford Trustee, Co-Treasurer 17/05/2012

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Irirangi Te Kani Trustee, Chairperson 22/01/2024
Matthew Matuakore Clark Trustee 29/08/2023
Te Aorangi Harrington Trustee 27/07/2023
Nga Mate Honore o te Pakanga (Honor) Goldsmith Trustee, Secretary 22/03/2019
Albert Taylor Trustee 31/01/2019
Russell Mancklin Holland Trustee 3/05/2017
Timothy Gander Secretary, Trustee 20/03/2017
Lara Meyer Trustee 17/03/2017
Manu Stuart Caddie ex-Chair, Advisor 18/03/2016
Ngarangi Walker Supporter 19/10/2015
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
5/07/2024 NOC032
26/03/2024 NOC031
13/02/2024 NOC029
6/09/2023 NOC028
24/08/2022 NOC025
2/09/2021 NOC022
28/08/2020 NOC020
11/12/2019 NOC019
5/07/2019 NOC018
25/03/2019 NOC016
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.