pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Multicultural Association Hawkes Bay Incorporated
CC49272
9429043091508
Registered

Registration details

2/05/2013
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 311
Hastings
4156

Charity's other details

0223155751
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/search/top/?q=multicultural%20association%2C%20hawkes%20bay%20inc


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To promote and protect the interest of the many different ethnic groups in Hawkes Bay

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Support the multicultural communities in Hawke's Bay)

Community development

Education / training / research, Arts / culture / heritage, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

Migrants / refugees

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public, Family / whanau, Religious groups

Entity Structure

an incorporated society with 8 board members and about 50-100 members, individuals, community groups and businesses

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2022 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2021 2/01/2022 $150,885 $25,176
31/12/2020 5/01/2021 $77,716 $59,075
31/12/2019 27/11/2019 $28,621 $25,086
31/12/2018 28/06/2019 $29,242 $35,487
31/12/2017 25/07/2019 $34,431 $33,703
31/12/2016 30/11/2016 $41,054 $26,677
31/12/2015 17/11/2015 $52,205 $41,487
31/12/2014 27/11/2014 $25,377 $20,794
31/12/2013 11/12/2013 $13,645 $6,975

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Satyam Saha President 12/02/2022
Anna Retno Widayanti CPA Secretary 30/01/2022
Syfuddin Ahmmed CA Treasurer 30/01/2022
Rizwaana Latiff Vice President 22/01/2022
Shavnam Gulnazz Board Member 22/01/2022
Wahid Yosofi Board Member 22/01/2022
Heather Elizabeth Brown Board Member 28/11/2020
Leah Baterbonia Board Member 28/11/2020

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Neomal Kalum Mario Attapattu Board Member 30/01/2022
Sukhdeep Singh President 30/01/2022
Vivi Evita Ramdhani Widiati Board Member 30/01/2022
Angelina Swastika Chand Board Member 1/09/2021
Shimul Islam Treasurer 1/07/2021
Aaron Wayne Huata Secretary 1/05/2021
Bogdana Brodiana Secretary 28/11/2020
Palanapathirage Dias Treasurer 28/11/2020
Jenny Too Board Member 16/11/2019
Rizwaana Latiff Chair Person 16/11/2019

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
6/03/2022 NOC020
16/02/2022 NOC019
16/02/2022 NOC018
12/02/2022 NOC016
8/01/2021 NOC014
15/12/2020 NOC012
26/11/2019 NOC010
21/05/2019 NOC007
30/11/2016 NOC004
27/01/2015 NOC002

Charity Documents