Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Special Olympics Greenhithe Charitable Trust
CC49280
N/A
Registered

Registration details

28/05/2013
December 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Special Olympics Greenhithe 28/05/2013
Special Olympics Greenhithe Charitable Trust 31/12/2021

Address for service

PO Box 38344
Wellington Mail Centre
Petone
Lower Hutt
5045
93 Hutt Park Road
RD 2
Moera
Lower Hutt
5010

Charity's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

WE provide quality year-round training and competition in a variety of sports for all children and adults with an intellectual disability, giving those athletes opportunities to develop physical fitness, demonstrate courage and participate in sharing life skills and friendships with their families, other athletes and the community.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Runs sports competitions for people with intellectual disabilities), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

People with disabilities

Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation, Economic development, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering, Sport/ recreation for people with intellectual disabilities

Other (please state)

(People with intellectual disabilities), Children / young people, People with disabilities, General public

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 28/08/2024 $26,281 $18,472 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 31/08/2023 11/09/2023 $8,381 $24,945 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 23/06/2022 $29,275 $17,900 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 6/05/2021 $6,500 $6,402 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 19/05/2020 $10,698 $8,734 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 17/06/2019 $10,035 $7,552 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 19/06/2018 $17,517 $21,629 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 2/05/2017 $7,015 $4,559 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 12/05/2016 $4,638 $3,432 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Angela Dickinson Football Manager 1/02/2024
Donna Gower Secretary 26/03/2022
Wynford Lewis Chairperson/Treasurer 28/03/2020
Dean Frost Committee Member 23/03/2019
Jacqueline Adams Basketball Manager 27/03/2010

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Karen Nyenkamp Committee Member 31/12/2023
Tracy Findlay Football Manager 31/12/2023
Darelle Campbell-Howard Committee Member 3/05/2023
Darelle Campbell-Howard Committee Member 11/05/2021
Karen Nyencamp Committee Member 11/05/2021
Tracy Ward Committee Member 11/05/2021
Darelle Campbell-Howard Secretary 28/03/2020
Marian De Koning Committee Member 28/03/2020
Janine Scott Vice President 4/05/2019
Jadyn Dixon Committee Member 23/03/2019
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
16/07/2022 NOC017
16/07/2022 NOC016
12/07/2022 NOC015
13/05/2021 NOC012
11/05/2021 NOC011
8/05/2016 NOC004
10/08/2015 NOC003
21/08/2014 NOC002
15/05/2014 NOC001

Charity Documents


Notices

This entity was removed from a single entity group (CC42351) on 19 July 2022.

load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.