Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Special Olympics Papakura
CC49460
N/A
Registered

Registration details

5/08/2013
December 31

Address for service

123 Dominion Road
Papakura
2110

Charity's other details

Special Olympics Papakura


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

We provide quality year-round training and competition in a variety of sports for all children and adults with an intellectual disability, giving those athletes opportunities to develop physical fitness, demonstrate courage and participate in sharing life skills and friendships with their families, other athletes and the community.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Sport Programme)

People with disabilities

Health, Sport / recreation

People with disabilities

Children / young people, Older people, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Legal Structure

Incorporated Society

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 22/08/2024 $40,240 $25,959 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 30/09/2023 22/08/2024 $74,522 $71,912 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 14/06/2022 $30,630 $36,019 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 31/07/2021 13/07/2021 $29,948 $24,629 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 31/07/2020 25/06/2020 $6,202 $11,778 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 20/06/2019 $9,014 $19,362 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 28/06/2018 $92,295 $93,616 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 1/06/2017 $15,591 $7,337 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 26/05/2016 $12,573 $11,496 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Sarah Jamieson Secretary/Treasurer 7/04/2024
Karen Smith Chairperson/Co-ordinator 12/04/2016
Glennis Godfrey Sports Co-ordinator 18/04/2013

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Linda Hancock Secretary/Treasurer 28/07/2024
Fiona Rongo Grants Officer 7/04/2024
Susan Moxon Secretary/Treasurer 1/05/2023
Johanna Fincham Assistant Treasurer 21/04/2022
Linda Hancock Treasurer 1/04/2021
Jane Muir-James Volunteer Coordinator 22/04/2020
Lenore Lawrence Committee Member 22/04/2020
Rebecca Webb Secretary 22/04/2020
Steven Alan Ramlose Athlete Representative 22/04/2020
Jackie Turvey Grants Officer 9/04/2019
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
5/06/2024 NOC011
2/08/2022 NOC009
17/05/2016 NOC002
15/05/2014 NOC001

Charity Documents


Notices

This entity was removed from a single entity group (CC42351) on 5 June 2024.

load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.