Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


IT'S ACCESSIBLE
CC49580
9429043255610
Registered

Registration details

5/08/2013
March 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
I.T's Accessible 5/08/2013
IT'S Accessible 2/03/2015
IT'S ACCESSIBLE 2/10/2019

Address for service

26 Coburg Street
Henderson
Auckland
612

Charity's other details

02102310302
09 837 1166
https://www.facebook.com/itsaccessible/
https://twitter.com/itsaccessible1
https://www.linkedin.com/in/deanobrengun/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

We develop free custom websites for non-profit community organisations. We coach the physically and mentally impaired through video tutorials and provide them with free hardware or software when needed to bridge the gap between MOH and ACC. We are unique because we have physically impaired volunteer professionals volunteering in our team.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(We provide education, free software and hardware for people with physical or mental impairments and free website development to non-profit organisations.)

Community development

I.T for the physically and mentally impaired and free website development to non-profit organisations.

Other (please state)

(Disabilities and all types of non-profit community organisations.)

Entity Structure

Incorporated Charitable Trust

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 22/08/2023 $5,191 $1,821 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 22/08/2022 $1,783 $1,923 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 7/08/2021 $1,232 $1,588 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 1/08/2020 $5,296 $1,668 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 2/10/2019 $82 $2,368 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 15/05/2018 $4,011 $3,201 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 18/06/2017 $2,651 $1,414 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 15/12/2016 $3,420 $1,205 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2015 30/09/2015 23/11/2015 $104 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Bonnie Xu Trustee 18/01/2023
Special Chang Vice Chairperson 18/01/2023
Steven Anderson Trustee 1/08/2018
Dean Anthony Brennan CE / Chairperson 11/08/2012

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Vardeep Randhawa Secretary 30/08/2023
Raymond Tan Chairperson 28/08/2023
Muwali Zimba Treasurer 20/08/2023
Stephen Gillett Treasurer 10/05/2023
Michael Brendan McHugh Vice Chairman 4/05/2023
Destiny Faith Hill Laurence Brennan Secretary 22/08/2022
Aroha Michelle Harriet Pene Secretary 1/08/2019
Teremoana Va'a Secretary 3/08/2016
Jason Andrews Treasurer 27/07/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
24/12/2023 NOC022
30/08/2023 NOC021
22/08/2023 NOC020
16/05/2023 NOC018
4/05/2023 NOC017
4/05/2023 NOC016
22/03/2023 NOC014
14/03/2023 NOC013
14/03/2023 NOC012
19/06/2017 NOC006
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.