Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Mount Olive Assembly of God Trust Board
CC49746
9429043121748
Registered

Registration details

17/09/2013
March 31

Address for service

7 Clyro Place
Mangere East
Auckland
2024

Charity's other details

09 275 1373


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

We are a church in Mangere East that exists to promote God's word in a way that is relevant and helpful for peoples daily lives, to provide a place of belonging for those who attend and to make a positive difference within our community by helping individuals.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Religious activities

Social services

Religious groups

Children / young people, Other charities, Older people, General public

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return for the year ending 31 December 2013 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 30/09/2024 $17,012 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 30/09/2023 $21,842 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 25/09/2022 $14,583 $15,539 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 31/12/2021 2/12/2021 $26,083 $4,649 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 31/12/2020 13/01/2021 $13,720 $7,544 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 25/09/2019 $13,754 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 18/09/2018 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 30/10/2017 $10,356 $6,536 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 1/08/2016 $7,287 $14 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Petelo Tauaalo Takapu Trustee 1/01/2019
Litea Kaloniata Matangi Secretary 3/07/2016
Raymond Matangi Trustee 20/08/2003

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Sioeli Manisela Trustee 1/01/2019
Aleksanita Lutui Trustee 5/07/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
30/10/2017 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.