pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Rinchen Jungdan Dongrum Gyal Foundation
Rinchen Foundation
CC49783
9429043251759
Registered

Registration details

13/09/2013
March 31

Address for service

485 Hill Street
Richmond
7020

Charity's other details

035449362


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Provide material support for the awareness, understanding, study and practice of Buddhism

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides religious services / activities

Religious activities

Accommodation / housing

Religious groups

Other charities, General public

Entity Structure

Governed by the Trust Board

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2023 30/09/2023 $17,081 $14,396
30/09/2022 29/09/2022 $14,595 $26,005
30/09/2021 30/09/2021 $83,382 $30,700
30/09/2020 29/09/2020 $142,353 $57,162
30/09/2019 4/07/2019 $238,088 $40,274
30/09/2018 29/09/2018 $225,649 $64,103
30/09/2017 25/09/2017 $250,616 $19,870
30/09/2016 30/09/2016 $58,578 $30,904
30/09/2015 29/09/2015 $179,999 $45,650
30/09/2014 28/09/2014 $119,982 $8,629

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Darrell Kilian Secretary 10/01/2014
Daniel Stuart Brownlees Chairperson 29/08/2013
Rhonda Gail Brownlees Trustee 29/08/2013

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Christine Sophia Kalimurti Secretary 10/01/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
15/01/2014 NOC001

Charity Documents