pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Virtuoso Strings Charitable Trust Board
Virtuoso Strings Charitable Trust
CC50199
9429043253104
Registered

Registration details

11/02/2014
March 31

Address for service

Unit 2
73 Kenepuru Drive
Kenepuru
Porirua
5022
Unit 2
73 Kenepuru Drive
Kenepuru
Porirua
5022

Charity's other details

02102617065
Facebook icon image
www.facebook.com/VirtuosoStringsPorirua


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Our mission is to generate social benefit through the provision of accessible, inclusive and holistic music education with an emphasis on group music-making.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Provides tuition, instruments, meals, trips & recreation, free of charge to youth who would not otherwise have such opportunities. Runs orchestras, holiday programmes, and concerts.)

Education / training / research

Community development, Arts / culture / heritage

Children / young people

Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees, socially or economically disadvantaged communities or families

Entity Structure

The Virtuoso Strings Charitable Trust Board is a registered and incorporated charity governed by trustees appointed according to the board's trust deed.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2023 29/09/2023 $273,520 $261,804
30/09/2022 3/10/2022 $391,024 $406,342
30/09/2021 20/10/2021 $398,796 $315,280
31/10/2020 29/10/2020 $541,610 $454,264
30/09/2019 30/09/2019 $305,857 $311,797
30/09/2018 30/09/2018 $170,269 $152,271
30/09/2017 8/10/2017 $96,288 $70,564
30/09/2016 27/06/2016 $82,984 $52,020
30/09/2015 9/11/2015 $34,413 $24,440
30/09/2014 30/09/2014 $352 $2

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
James Pese Trustee 14/09/2023
Takirirangi Smith Trustee 17/07/2023
Soulivone Phonevilay Trustee 28/04/2023
Sally Jane Norman Trustee 3/05/2022
Hongzhi Gao Trustee 29/11/2021
Graeme John Ogilvie Trustee 12/08/2021

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Elizabeth Sarah Neal Sneyd Trustee 14/12/2022
Arthur Anthony Shaw Trustee 12/08/2021
Hon Luamanuvao Dame Winifred Alexandra Laban Trustee 12/08/2021
James Faraimo Trustee 12/08/2021
Paul Raymond Setefano Trustee 12/08/2021
Robert James Barton Trustee 12/08/2021
Toli Sagaga Trustee 12/08/2021
Elizabeth Sarah Neal Sneyd First Trustee 5/11/2020
Joyce Fuatavai Trustee 20/12/2018
Siang Kuen Jeffries First Trustee 2/02/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
30/08/2023 NOC028
19/07/2023 NOC027
9/06/2023 NOC026
13/01/2023 NOC025
16/05/2022 NOC023
16/05/2022 NOC022
3/05/2022 NOC020
3/05/2022 NOC019
29/11/2021 NOC018
17/08/2021 NOC016

Charity Documents