Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Friends of Animal Charities (Acronym: FOAC)
CC50479
9429043242146
Registered

Registration details

1/05/2014
March 31

Address for service

36 Kohekohe Road
Waikanae
5036

Charity's other details

04 905 3823
https://www.facebook.com/FOACKapiti/


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To raise funds for any project that is of assistance and benefit to organisations whose objectives are for the sole benefits and welfare of animals and/ or which promote the care and well being of animals.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Fund-raising

Care / protection of animals

Animals

Other charities

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 28/06/2024 $121,779 $123,275 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 22/05/2023 $124,130 $123,660 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 21/05/2022 $106,888 $109,646 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 19/05/2021 $96,218 $89,794 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 19/08/2020 $90,941 $98,567 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 19/07/2019 $84,010 $79,761 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 31/08/2018 $84,458 $78,396 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 19/06/2017 $74,968 $82,949 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 20/06/2016 $64,436 $59,371 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2015 30/09/2015 21/07/2015 $57,977 $43,803 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Annette Buckley Committee Member 29/06/2024
Debbie Noon Chairperson 22/05/2023
Sandra Knight Secretary 18/06/2018
Carol Margaret Cowper Committee Member 9/05/2016
Janine Tieman Committee Member 9/05/2016
Pam Collinge Committee Member 15/06/2015
Hazel Milliner Committee Member 22/09/2014
Brenda Marion Cavanagh Treasurer 19/09/2012

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Victoria Mollison Committee Member 31/12/2022
Chris McKee Committee 2/05/2022
Loretta Brady Committee Member 31/03/2019
Linda Gill Vice Chairperson 18/06/2018
Mary Catherine McCartan Secretary 18/06/2017
Ursula Mary Scott Committee Member 18/06/2017
Joyce Noeline Goslin Vice Chairperson 31/03/2016
Freda Janet Peake Trustee 13/02/2015
Rachel Frances Oliver Chairperson 16/09/2014
Janine Tieman Trustee 24/05/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
7/02/2024 NOC019
2/07/2017 NOC010
19/06/2016 NOC005
19/06/2016 NOC004
15/04/2015 NOC003
23/09/2014 NOC002
22/06/2014 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.