Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Child Rescue Charitable Trust
Child Rescue
CC50592
N/A
Registered

Registration details

23/05/2014
March 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Destiny Rescue Charitable Trust 23/05/2014
Child Rescue Charitable Trust 11/08/2017

Address for service

PO Box 12670
Penrose
Auckland
1642
55 Hugo Johnston Drive
Penrose
Auckland
1061

Charity's other details

021870159


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To promote education, advocacy, awareness and fundraising including financial asset investing in NZ for the benefit of rescuing, restoring and protecting vulnerable children from sexual exploitation, relief from poverty and suffering.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Advocacy, investing awareness and fundraising)

Fund-raising

Education / training / research, Health, Emergency / disaster relief, Social services, Religious activities, Promotion of volunteering, Rescue Children

Children / young people

Other charities, Migrants / refugees, Religious groups

Entity Structure

The trust consists of four volunteer trustees, one of which acts as Chairperson. The Trust employs a full time NZ CEO and three part-time staff who implement the organisation’s mission and strategy. The entity is affiliated with Destiny Rescue International (a 501 c3 US entity ) and the Child Rescue Charitable Aid Trust (CC50751).

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 14/12/2023 $243,679 $223,990 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 23/09/2022 $265,888 $185,881 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 31/10/2021 1/11/2021 $235,143 $269,820 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 31/10/2020 2/11/2020 $490,284 $350,805 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 31/10/2019 5/11/2019 $141,657 $115,495 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 31/10/2018 2/01/2019 $126,507 $121,135 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 22/12/2017 $132,871 $111,289 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 24/01/2017 $49,445 $96,768 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2015 30/09/2015 26/01/2017 $113,681 $74,004 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Steven Anton Perich Trustee 29/10/2020
Brian John Saipe CEO 11/02/2019
Jonathan Victor William Watts Trustee 24/08/2017
John David Koppel Trustee 6/06/2014
Wendy Margaret Steele Trustee 14/02/2014

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Hailey Elizabeth Morrison Trustee 19/03/2020
Jacqueline Anne Ironside Trustee 19/03/2020
James Michael Newcombe Palmer Chairperson 10/08/2018
Simon Clayton Goodall Trustee 31/07/2016
Tony William Kirwan Trsutee 6/06/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
17/06/2020 NOC016
4/10/2019 NOC014
13/12/2018 NOC012
21/08/2018 NOC011
14/08/2018 NOC010
12/10/2017 NOC008
21/09/2017 NOC007
26/05/2017 NOC006
26/05/2017 NOC005
23/05/2017 NOC004
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.