Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Te Arawa Ki Tai Charitable Trust
Te Arawa ki Tai Trust
CC50710
9429043254576
Registered

Registration details

28/04/2014
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 542
Te Puke
3153
123 Jellicoe Street
Te Puke 3119
Te Puke
3119

Charity's other details

027 5332372


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

Affiliation with iwi and/or hapū, Focuses on outcomes for Māori, Ownership

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

1. To advance the education, training and knowledge of tangata whenua of the Te Arawa ki Tai rohe on ways of understanding, protecting and enhancing the natural environment 2. To assist tangata whenua in their kaitiakitanga of the environment of the Te Arawa ki Tai rohe in respect of sustainable development 3. To expand traditional knowledges and Matauranga Maori based on the legacy of the ancestor, Ngatoroirangi as pertains to the Te Arawa ki Tai Trust area

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Sponsors / undertakes research

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides advice / information / advocacy

Education / training / research

Environment / conservation

Other (please state)

(Te Arawa Iwi, hapu and individuals )

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 24/09/2024 $421,481 $421,340 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 4/09/2023 $1,535,021 $184,706 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 30/08/2022 $187,549 $138,543 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 23/09/2021 $133,925 $165,750 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 28/09/2020 $111,948 $81,203 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 23/09/2019 $15,906 $40,435 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 28/09/2018 $825 $10,692 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 20/09/2017 $1,307 $46,004 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 28/09/2016 $296,468 $66,276 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Jimi Atarea McLean Trustee 10/11/2024
Laise Harris Trustee 1/09/2020
Heeni Matehaere Hope Treasurer 1/09/2016
Pia Carey Bennett Trustee 26/11/2013
Raewyn Marcelle Bennett Chairperson 26/11/2013

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Wiremu Rupa Williams Trustee 10/11/2024
Wally Victor Hohepa Lee Trustee 1/09/2020
Michelle Jade Tapsell Trustee 1/05/2019
Tanira Kingi Trustee 1/05/2019
Justin Haronga Te Kowhai Trustee 18/06/2018
Katerina Williams Secretary 8/09/2017
Te Kipa Kepa Brian Morgan Trustee 8/09/2017
Elaine Rawinia Tapsell Secretary 31/08/2016
Jimi Aterea McLean Officer 24/04/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
20/02/2025 NOC019
20/02/2025 NOC018
23/01/2025 NOC017
29/03/2021 NOC011
23/09/2019 NOC009
11/10/2018 NOC007
18/06/2018 NOC005
21/05/2015 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.