pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


One Double Five Whare Awhina Community House Trust
155 Community House and Taitokerau Community Law
CC50718
N/A
Registered

Registration details

24/06/2014
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 8134
Kensington
Whangarei
0145
155 Kamo Road
Kensington
Whangarei
0112

Charity's other details

09 4370185


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Vision: A just society. Mission: Looking to the future over a cup-of-tea. Values: A listening place with manaakitanga, hosting, hospitality, hui and warmth. An inclusive place for whānaungatanga. A place for whakapapa - a bridge, a connecting point, joining with other projects outside the whare. A place that values the whole environment - Tupuna, Rangi, Papa, Io, spiritual resources. Strategic goals 1. Te Tiriti o Waitangi will guide how the Trust carries out its work. 2. To recognise and enhance the skills of people and whānau in Te Taitokerau area. To foster a community where people feel they are valued, supported and able to realise their full potential. 3. To give priority for those in need and marginalised. 4. To maintain a welcoming community house that promotes the growth of new community projects and where all feel equal and safe 5. To care for our workers. 6. To work on community development projects 7. To build sustainable partnerships

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Community development

Social services, Community law office

Family / whanau

Children / young people, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public

Entity Structure

One Double Five Whare Awhina Community House is governed by not less than 4 trustees. A CEO is employed by and reports to the trust. Employees and volunteers are organised by the CEO.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2020 22/12/2020 $1,462,714 $1,220,121
31/12/2019 8/01/2020 $993,691 $890,081
31/12/2018 7/01/2019 $803,405 $671,318
31/12/2017 13/12/2017 $557,569 $502,027
31/12/2016 13/12/2016 $682,780 $467,457
31/12/2015 20/01/2016 $533,038 $532,077

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Sally Louise Woods Trustee 8/12/2020
Darren Collins Trustee 14/07/2020
Shirleyanne Brown Trustee 13/08/2019
Suman Rattan Trustee 9/10/2018
David Nicholas Trustee 24/06/2014
Paul Bathurst Trustee 24/06/2014
Elizabeth Cassidy-Nelson Trustee 23/06/2014
Mary Nicholas Trustee 23/06/2014

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Aroha Shelford Trustee 22/07/2021
Robert Harte Trustee 8/12/2020
Takurangi Anita Yorke Trustee 19/03/2019

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
17/09/2021 NOC012
30/08/2021 NOC011
8/05/2021 NOC010
28/01/2021 NOC009
22/08/2019 NOC006
11/01/2019 NOC005
14/06/2017 NOC002

Charity Documents