Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Lucky Clover Community Trust
A Better Chance Charitable Trust
CC50832
9429043283729
Registered

Registration details

14/07/2014
March 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
A Better Chance Charitable Trust 14/07/2014
Lucky Clover Community Trust 1/06/2022

Address for service

2163 Great North Road
Avondale
Auckland
0600

Charity's other details

09 828 8333


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

1. To assist Chinese migrants overcoming physical, emotional, and social difficulties as they settle into and establish new lives in New Zealand; and 2. To assist Chinese migrants to gain a better understanding and appreciation of their new environments 3. To facilitate the connection between the Chinese migrant and multi-cutural communities by providing education, recreation and sonsultation services.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Other (please state)

(Migrant Services), Community development, Social services

Migrants / refugees

Children / young people, Older people, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

The entity structure is a charitable trust consisting of a board of trustees overseeing the running of the trust.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 2/10/2024 $614,837 $470,980 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 30/09/2023 $750,605 $635,548 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 30/09/2022 $635,333 $794,078 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 30/09/2021 $561,424 $752,209 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 25/08/2020 $783,222 $598,375 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 6/07/2020 $637,426 $544,459 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 7/02/2019 $323,586 $310,694 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 24/09/2017 $288,953 $281,168 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 9/01/2017 $122,686 $110,052 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Qianlin Luo Trustee 2/08/2022
Eric Nong Trustee 20/11/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Jennifer Jie Liu Trustee 2/08/2022
Jianhua Chen Trustee 2/08/2022
Kerui Huang Trustee 30/11/2019
Dong Zhao Trustee 29/06/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
29/03/2022 NOC010
20/07/2020 NOC007
28/01/2019 NOC004
1/08/2018 NOC003

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.