Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


"The Incubator" Growing Art and Culture Charitable Trust Board
The Incubator Creative Hub
CC50884
9429043318100
Registered

Registration details

19/03/2014
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 841
Tauranga
3144
159 Seventeenth Avenue
Tauranga South
Tauranga
3112

Charity's other details

075713232
https://www.facebook.com/theincubatortauranga


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Incubator Creative Hub is a unique enterprise based at the Historic Village in Tauranga. Spawned from a simple idea for a platform to connect the creative sector. It has now become a centre for artistic innovation and creative expression. A creative arts experience can transcend and combine cultures, sparking ideas and positive intentions changing how people view themselves and the world around them. Currently, a small management team supports delivery of an extensive and diverse range of creative programmes, activities and events on a daily basis. This includes regular art education programmes, public workshops, training, music performance and exhibitions, through to large scale events and festivals that see thousands of people visit from across the region and beyond.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Establishing a positive holistic network where our collective experience and energy can inspire , motivate and teach others.

Arts / culture / heritage

Education / training / research, Community development, Fund-raising, Grass roots level arts of all genre

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, People with disabilities, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 17/09/2024 $1,035,077 $1,027,659 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 20/08/2023 $995,230 $818,872 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 19/09/2022 $628,639 $630,436 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 22/08/2021 $640,649 $547,233 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 20/08/2020 $537,549 $504,823 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 12/08/2019 $415,309 $375,858 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/11/2018 29/11/2018 $257,605 $221,733 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 20/08/2017 $131,778 $142,237 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 19/09/2016 $99,757 $110,645 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
James Kyle Wilson Trustee 24/11/2023
Amanda Weatherley Trustee 9/06/2023
Tracey Elizabeth Cooper Trustee 9/06/2023
Marcel Hediger Trustee 30/07/2021
Phil Hayhoe Chair of the Trust - Trustee 29/01/2021
Max Kelly Greer Trustee- Treasurer 1/06/2016

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Toni Hadlee Trustee 25/10/2024
Ken McCleod White Trustee 28/07/2022
Kathleen Annette Wilson Trustee 7/03/2022
Nick Pharo Trustee 25/02/2022
James Kyle Wilson Trustee 28/02/2021
Francisca Monica Vogelzang Chairperson 29/01/2021
Paula Jane Trubshaw Trustee 1/05/2020
Emlyn George Hatch Trustee 25/07/2019
Sumit Vijay Oza Trustee 25/07/2019
Gordon Bruce Lockhart Trustee 1/02/2019
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
21/10/2024 NOC030
16/11/2023 NOC028
9/06/2023 NOC026
1/08/2022 NOC024
15/03/2022 NOC023
25/02/2022 NOC022
6/08/2021 NOC020
17/03/2021 NOC019
3/03/2021 NOC018
26/02/2021 NOC017
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.