Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Waihi Community Youth Trust
Waihi Youth Centre
CC51011
N/A
Deregistered
20/08/2020
This entity was removed from the Charities Register under section 32(1)(b) of the Charities Act because it failed to file Annual Returns as required by section 41 of the Charities Act.

Below are details of Waihi Community Youth Trust at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

13/10/2014
March 31

Registration history

Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 20/08/2020 This entity was removed from the Charities Register under section 32(1)(b) of the Charities Act because it failed to file Annual Returns as required by section 41 of the Charities Act.
Registered 13/10/2014

Address for service

PO Box 194
Paeroa
3640
83 Mataura Road
Waihi 3610
Maeroa
Waihi
3610

Charity's other details

021722020
https://www.facebook.com/youthwaihi/


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The purpose of the Waihi Community Youth Trust is to provide free activities & a space for Youth at Risk in the Waihi Community free from drugs, alcohol & Violence. We also aim to empower our Tamariki in our Waihi Community.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Social services

Education / training / research, Health, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering

Children / young people

People with disabilities, General public, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Charitable Trust which governs the Management of the Waihi Youth Centre and its Youth Workers & Volunteers.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 24/10/2018 $22,091 $39,028 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 7/06/2017 $52,371 $35,898 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2015 30/09/2015 17/02/2016 Restricted Restricted Restricted Restricted

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Lisa Finau-Donaldson Trustee - Chairperson 15/02/2017
Karren Dodd Trustee / Secretary-Treasurer 11/02/2016
Max McLean Trustee 28/04/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Mary Carmine Trustee 6/01/2019
Andrew John Kirk Trustee 31/10/2017
Michael Todd Trustee 14/01/2017
Norma Mary Tautasi Trustee 31/03/2015
James Douglas Bowring Trustee 30/03/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
4/03/2020 NOC004
4/05/2015 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.