Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


ANZUP Cancer Trials Group Limited
CC51217
N/A
Registered

Registration details

16/01/2015
March 31

Address for service

Level 6, 119-143 Missenden Road
Camperdown
NSW
Australia
2050

Charity's other details

+61 2 9562 5042
+61 2 9562 5008
https://www.facebook.com/ANZUPtrials/
https://twitter.com/ANZUPtrials
https://www.instagram.com/anzuptrials/

Oceania

Australia


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To conduct clinical trial research to improve treatment of Bladder, Kidney, Testicular and Prostate Cancer

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Cancer clinical trials research), Sponsors / undertakes research

Other (please state)

(Cancer research), Education / training / research, Health

Other (please state)

(People diagnosed with urogenital cancers), Children / young people, Older people, General public

Entity Structure

A company limited by guarrantee

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 8/10/2023 $9,476,790 $8,386,949 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 10/10/2022 $6,293,027 $714,970 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 30/09/2021 $5,436,584 $3,958,843 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 29/09/2021 $5,722,113 $4,433,268 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 30/08/2019 $4,510,054 $4,383,202 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 12/09/2018 $3,966,552 $3,411,696 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 22/09/2017 $2,593,257 $1,580,716 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 15/08/2016 $1,660,600 $1,385,886 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2015 30/09/2015 11/09/2015 $1,558,725 $1,003,103 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Lisa Horvath Board Director 20/07/2020
Shomik Sengupta Board Director 13/07/2015
Nicholas Buchan Appointed Director 15/12/2014
Martin George Dowling Board Director 1/05/2013
Margaret McJannett Company Secretary and CEO 15/12/2010
Giuseppe Esposito Deputy Chair 13/12/2010
Glenn Ferguson Board Director 30/08/2010
Henry Woo Board Director 25/06/2010
Ian Davis Chair 9/10/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Linda Martin Board Director 1/04/2022
Guy Toner Deputy Chair 20/07/2020
Lizbeth Kenny Treasurer 13/07/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
11/03/2015 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.