Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Restore Church Tauranga Trust
Restore Church
CC51363
9429043272679
Registered

Registration details

3/03/2015
March 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Arataki Community Church Trust 3/03/2015
Restore Church Tauranga Trust 6/08/2023

Address for service

170 Cheyne Road
Pyes Pa
Tauranga
3112

Charity's other details

027 923 7236
N/A
https://www.facebook.com/RestoreChurchTauranga/
https://twitter.com/RestoreTauranga
https://www.instagram.com/restoretauranga/


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Provides religious services

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Religious activities

Community development, Promotion of volunteering

Religious groups

Children / young people, Other charities, Older people, People with disabilities, General public, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

The Church is incorporated as a Trust in accordance with the provisions of the Charitable Trusts Act 1957 and registered as a charity in terms of the Charities Act 2005 (Registration Number CC51363). The Church is not controlled by another registered charity for reporting purposes. The rules of the Church were established in February 2015 and have not changed during this period. Arataki Community Church is led by Pastor Oskar Sigurdsson. He is supported in leadership by a committee of Elders.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 2/05/2025 $241,516 $204,438 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 8/05/2024 $196,413 $179,866 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 1/05/2023 $212,492 $188,926 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 4/10/2022 $221,064 $161,567 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 4/10/2021 $106,133 $91,745 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 30/08/2020 $78,916 $79,822 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 10/08/2019 $63,427 $61,082 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 6/09/2018 $51,043 $35,227 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 28/09/2017 $23,186 $21,449 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 29/09/2016 $31,481 $30,568 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Willi Olsen Trustee 12/04/2022
Brian Bernard Chairperson 11/02/2020
Suzanne Kathryn Hayes Trustee 13/11/2018
Robyn Mathilda Margaret Nepia Treasurer / Administrator 25/07/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Tracy Reinecke Trustee 30/06/2023
Joseph Tekaraka Hape Trustee Member 14/04/2021
Terry Royden Grimes Chairperson 13/04/2021
Diane Iola Goulton Trustee Member 1/08/2020
Michael Anthony Hayes Chairperson/trustee/senior minister 13/11/2018
Anna Gardiner Trustee 25/07/2017
Huhi Pire Rauhihi Trustee 25/07/2017

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
26/09/2023 NOC033
19/09/2023 NOC032
17/07/2023 NOC031
29/09/2022 NOC027
22/06/2022 NOC025
20/06/2022 NOC024
12/07/2021 NOC022
6/07/2021 NOC020
23/05/2021 NOC019
18/05/2021 NOC018
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.