pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


St Johns Presbyterian Church, Papatoetoe
St Johns Presbyterian Church and Community Centre
CC51612
N/A
Registered

Registration details

22/04/2015
June 30

Address for service

P O Box 23532
Manukau City
Auckland
2241

Charity's other details

09-2782746


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide a place of Christian worship and learning in a multicultural environment. WE seek to service the community through the lives of members and our community centre activities, this includes children/young people, people with disabilities, multiethnic, multifaith, refugees and immigrants. To do this well we work in partnership with others included Aorere College ACE , MOE and InnerCity Women's Group etc

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides buildings / facilities / open space, Community Centre

Religious activities

Education / training / research, Arts / culture / heritage, People with disabilities

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees, Religious groups

Entity Structure

A parish of Northern Presbytery of the PCANZ Governance in the Session of the Parish

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2021 14/10/2021 $260,662 $248,936
31/12/2020 3/11/2020 $896,231 $254,056
31/12/2019 18/09/2019 $258,193 $433,934
31/12/2018 24/11/2018 $254,297 $221,671
31/12/2017 29/11/2017 $197,498 $240,567
31/12/2016 2/11/2016 $192,679 $157,894
31/12/2015 17/11/2015 $262,262 $183,710

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Timothy Rose Minister 26/08/2021
Timothy Philip Rose Minister 29/07/2021
Naomi Kathleen Tamangaro Elder 11/03/2018
Amritha Samuel Board of Managers 10/07/2014
Pamela Humby Session Member 25/05/2014
Theresa Fa'amoana Session Member 25/05/2014
Teariki Maoate Session Member 4/08/2013
Jacqui Bycroft Session Member 9/10/2005
Maree Christine Allan Session Clerk 12/09/2001
Alan Robinson Session Clerk 14/03/1999

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Margaret Anne Low Minister 18/10/2021
Tulimatala Petaia Session Member 8/09/2021
Alofa Teofilo Session Member 1/07/2019
Puapii Mateora Session Member 10/11/2017
Helen Esene Session Member 9/11/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
15/10/2021 NOC007
29/09/2016 NOC001

Charity Documents