pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Kelmarna Community Farm Trust
CC51662
9429042657149
Registered

Registration details

15/04/2015
March 31
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Kelmarna Community Garden Trust 15/04/2015
Kelmarna Community Farm Trust 11/04/2023

Address for service

12 Hukanui Crescent
Ponsonby
Auckland
1021

Charity's other details

093760472/0273415599
Facebook icon image
Kelmarna Organic Community Gardens & City Farm
instagram - Kelmarna Gardens


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To champion and demonstrate a regenerative local food system that supports climate change mitigation, urban resilience and community wellbeing.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Community teaching garden and education centre)

Environment / conservation

Education / training / research, Health, Community development, Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation, Care / protection of animals, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Animals, People with disabilities

Entity Structure

Charitable Trust with trust board incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act 1957 (number 211524). The Trust has four staff engaged on a contractual basis. The Trust leases the land on which it runs the Gardens from Auckland Council. The land is zoned Reserve for Community Purposes.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2023 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2022 14/09/2022 $304,421 $275,642
30/09/2021 2/07/2021 $183,640 $202,759
30/09/2020 30/09/2020 $167,931 $164,689
30/09/2019 29/09/2019 $174,066 $152,660
30/09/2018 28/09/2018 $142,024 $109,295
30/09/2017 28/09/2017 $102,737 $94,316
30/09/2016 10/09/2016 $67,848 $57,360

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Christopher John Morrison Trustee 10/11/2022
Olivia Alexandra Coote Trustee 10/11/2022
Derek Robert Broadmore Trustee 15/09/2020
Isabel Bettina Yasmin Pasch Trustee 15/09/2020
Tracy Elena Lee Berno Trustee 15/09/2020
Nicholas Stephen Morrison Trustee 20/09/2019
Maryjane Bell Treasurer 7/09/2016

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Michael Graham-Stewart Trustee 1/08/2022
Kim Bellingham Trustee 6/04/2022
Simon John McArley Trustee 1/07/2021
Emma Louise Sharp Trustee 6/05/2021
Nicolla Maree Paull Trustee 1/09/2020
Phillippa Gordon Wilkie Chairperson 29/02/2020
Andrea Reid Trustee 3/02/2020
Margaret Patricia Fleming Secretary 31/01/2018
Claire O'Connell Trustee 1/05/2017
Mary Paul Chairperson 31/12/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
11/04/2023 NOC030
6/07/2021 NOC027
30/09/2020 NOC024
21/09/2020 NOC023
2/03/2020 NOC022
3/02/2020 NOC021
25/09/2019 NOC019
15/05/2019 NOC018
20/02/2018 NOC016
4/09/2017 NOC014

Charity Documents