pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Saving the Wild New Zealand
Saving the Wild
CC52014
N/A
Registered

Registration details

29/06/2015
June 30

Address for service

Restricted

Charity's other details


Africa

Benin, Botswana, Kenya, Malawi, Mozambique, Namibia, South Africa, Swaziland, Tanzania, Zambia, Zimbabwe

North America

United States

Asia

Burma (Myanmar), China, Sri Lanka, Thailand, Vietnam


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Saving the Wild is a major partner to Comvita New Zealand and SsangYong New Zealand - The charity is promoted through partner media campaigns & events across New Zealand. Saving the Wild also represented New Zealand at the 2021 Dubai World Expo. Saving the Wild does not ask the public for donations. Together with Comvita New Zealand, we are protecting the world's precious biodiversity and securing wild land in Kenya through a Maasai women empowerment project - financial independence through bee keeping. Funds from SsangYong New Zealand are spent on the protection of the rhino species / community. Activities: Provides advice / information / advocacy Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers) Sectors: Care / protection of animals Education / training / research, Environment / conservation, Community development, International activities, Economic development. Beneficiaries: Animals People of a certain ethnic / racial origin.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Care / protection of animals

Education / training / research, Environment / conservation, Community development, International activities, Economic development

Animals

People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public

Entity Structure

Charitable Trust - three trustees

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/01/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/01/2023 29/01/2023 $197,336 $168,477
31/12/2021 31/12/2021 $173,504 $152,888
31/12/2020 27/12/2020 $186,281 $229,225
31/12/2019 30/12/2019 $216,238 $242,858
31/12/2018 16/12/2018 $186,158 $189,459
31/12/2017 7/12/2017 $89,283 $45,582
31/12/2016 3/09/2017 $67,258 $13,459

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Simon Lucas Trustee 30/06/2019
Elliot Blade Trustee 18/03/2015
Jamie Joseph Trustee 18/03/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Samuel Moore Trustee 5/08/2019
Taryn Joseph Trustee 25/10/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
30/01/2023 NOC013
14/08/2019 NOC008
2/09/2018 NOC006
23/08/2018 NOC005
11/12/2017 NOC004
21/10/2016 NOC001

Charity Documents