Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Forest for People Limited
CC52147
9429041747797
Registered

Registration details

17/07/2015
March 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
THE ORANGUTAN PROJECT NEW ZEALAND LIMITED 17/07/2015
Forest for People Limited 8/12/2021

Address for service

Suite 5520 17b Farnham Street
Parnell
Auckland
1052

Charity's other details

+61 416 273 135

Asia

Indonesia, Malaysia


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Forests for People is a not-for- profit organisation supporting orangutan conservation, rainforest protection, local community partnerships and the rehabilitation and reintroduction of displaced orangutans back to the wild, in order to save the two orangutan species from extinction.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Community development

Environment / conservation, Care / protection of animals, Fund-raising

Other (please state)

(Indigenous communities)

Legal Structure

Company

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 24/04/2024 $6,210 $3,338 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 25/04/2023 $16,512 $2,360 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 3/05/2022 $664 $554 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 13/04/2021 $60,114 $50,080 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 5/10/2020 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 26/09/2019 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 26/09/2018 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 6/11/2017 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 12/09/2016 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Noeline Merle Holt Director 17/12/2020
Leif Robert Cocks Director 18/05/2015
Troy Roger Kenah Director 18/05/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Amy Leanne Robbins Director 27/05/2024
Carly Marie Day Director 30/06/2017

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
13/06/2024 NOC015
31/01/2022 NOC011
8/12/2021 NOC010
13/04/2021 NOC008
6/10/2017 NOC003

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.