Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Living Wage Movement Aotearoa NZ Incorporated
CC52267
9429043245109
Registered

Registration details

15/05/2015
March 31

Address for service

Private Bag 92645
Symonds Street
Grafton
Auckland
1150
644-648 Great South Road
Newton
Ellerslie
Auckland
1051

Charity's other details

021586195
https://www.facebook.com/LivingWageAotearoaNewZealand/
@LivingWageNZ
https://nz.linkedin.com/in/living-wage-movement-aotearoa-nz-a700731b8


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To facilitate and connect organisation of communities around a common goal of achieving a living wage as a necessary step in reducing inequality and poverty in NZ

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Encourage and promote the development of better policies for working people with the primary focus on rights to a living wage that will enable workers to live with dignity )

Other (please state)

(Develop the capacity and skills of the members of communities that support and advocate for low waged workers so that they are better able to identify and help meet their needs )

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees, Religious groups

Entity Structure

National Governance Board (elected) AGM (governance positions elected and policy and rules voted upon) Accreditation Advisory Committee (elected) Local Boards or Local Networks as need arises in locations where there is activity

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 19/07/2023 $509,668 $417,228 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 20/09/2022 $391,371 $379,947 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 13/09/2021 $353,158 $232,714 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 23/07/2020 $274,801 $210,444 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 23/08/2019 $191,640 $152,599 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 9/08/2018 $231,817 $244,121 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 24/08/2017 $189,805 $191,671 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 3/10/2016 $212,337 $186,165 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Sami Eden Smart Admin 28/09/2020
Stephen King Chair 23/07/2020
Chas Muir Governance Board member - faith 25/07/2018
Hiueni Nuku Governance Board Member 25/07/2018
Muriel Tunoho Governance Board Member 17/10/2014
Annabel Newman Treasurer 30/10/2013

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Camille Nakhid Governance Board Member 20/07/2023
Jennifer Dawson Board Member 20/07/2023
Gina Lockyer Board Chair 1/12/2022
Anna Casey-COx Governance Board Member 31/07/2022
Dennis Maga Governance Board member 31/07/2022
Sandra Joy Grey Governance Board Member 15/10/2020
Catriona Maclennan Secretary 23/07/2020
Shirley Zhuang Treasurer 23/07/2020
Lyndy McIntyre Community Organiser 1/05/2020
Marlon Drake Governance Committee Member 30/04/2020
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
19/07/2023 NOC016
6/03/2023 NOC015
14/08/2020 NOC011
14/08/2020 NOC010
27/07/2020 NOC009
15/04/2020 NOC007
1/10/2019 NOC006
10/08/2018 NOC004

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.