Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Church Alive New Zealand Trust
CC52444
9429043261284
Registered

Registration details

8/10/2015
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 13212
Onehunga
Auckland
1643

Charity's other details

0279589070
https://www.facebook.com/aliveintnz


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Providing support services for community, religious and spiritual activities, community food bank, homeless support.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Health, Community development, Social services, Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation, Fund-raising, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering

General public

Children / young people, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees, Religious groups

Entity Structure

Community Church group consisting of Pastoral team, leadership team and youth team.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 21/10/2024 $14,461 $14,302 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 25/08/2023 $20,031 $16,887 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 18/03/2023 $15,271 $13,100 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 17/03/2023 $32,410 $30,711 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 9/08/2021 $13,019 $11,948 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 23/04/2020 $22,745 $20,766 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 2/05/2019 $17,372 $14,345 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 29/01/2018 $10,424 $8,692 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 26/10/2016 $16,877 $17,471 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Donna Marie Katene - Muavae Secretary 23/02/2014
Ron Muavae Chairman 23/02/2014

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Frederick Louis Passi Trustee 31/03/2020
Apenera Teakariki Short Trustee 1/01/2020
Andrew Stock Trustee 1/12/2019
Elizabeth Short Treasurer 31/03/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
28/10/2022 NOC008
4/06/2019 NOC005
2/03/2017 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.