Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Ngati Ruaiti Nukumaru Marae Committee Incorporated
Nukumaru Marae Committee
CC52504
9429042695417
Registered

Registration details

21/10/2015
March 31

Address for service

2 Salisbury Avenue
Whanganui East
Whanganui
4500

Charity's other details

06 346 5707


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

Marae, Affiliation with iwi and/or hapū, Focuses on outcomes for Māori

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To Administer and maintain marae lands, buildings and historical sites, to preserve and advance the hapuu of Ngati Ruaiti. Administer and Maintain the marae and its environs for the use & benefit of the present and future whanau and hapu. To provide and assist educational opportunities and support to students. To help educate Iwi, Hapu and Community members while pursuing projects with environmental and cultural benefit. To support Iwi, Hapu and wider community with the provision of marae based cultural activities. Leasing or granting use of land & buildings in furtherance of those objects. Provide and maintain a fully functioning conferencing area to Educational groupe, Iwi, Hapu and community. Provide the use of land and buildings to Hapu, Iwi and community groups with cultural activities.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides religious services / activities

Marae on reservation land

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Health, Environment / conservation, Community development, Emergency / disaster relief, Social services, Religious activities, Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation, Economic development, Fund-raising, People with disabilities

People of a certain ethnic / racial origin

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, General public, Family / whanau, Religious groups

Entity Structure

Incorporated Society

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 1/07/2024 $126,018 $50,791 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 3/07/2023 $86,690 $59,368 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 27/01/2023 $59,780 $34,604 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 30/08/2021 $18,130 $42,047 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 28/09/2020 $70,666 $29,049 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 1/07/2019 $45,357 $31,771 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 29/08/2018 $16,017 $23,591 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 20/08/2017 $31,364 $26,067 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 1/03/2017 $45,161 $46,384 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Bibiana Katene Trustee 14/02/2023
Cathryn Kilmister Trustee 14/02/2023
Mike Neho Trustee 14/02/2023
Nina Davis-Nanai Secretary/Trustee 14/02/2023
Te Piwa Bullock Trustee 14/02/2023
Kara Katene Trustee 14/10/2015
Karina Rudolph Treasurer/Trustee 4/10/2015
Mervyn John Davis Chairman 7/10/2012
Carolyn Theresa Young Trustee 1/02/1992
Ta Pahunga Martin Davis Trustee 1/02/1992

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Bibiana Katene Trustee 14/02/2023
Mihipepene Katrina Susan Davis Trustee 14/02/2023
Renee Bradley Trustee 14/02/2023
Isabella Brownlie Trustee 3/06/2022
Delanie Davis-Nanai Secretary 5/10/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
7/05/2024 NOC016
5/05/2023 NOC014
5/05/2023 NOC013
13/04/2021 NOC010
17/08/2020 NOC008
20/01/2016 NOC002
16/11/2015 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.